Herron v. Patterson et al
Plaintiff: Edward J. Herron, IV
Defendant: Lewis Patterson and Patterson Supply Company, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv02141
Filed: November 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 2/2/2021 10:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion. This conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for the plaintiff, who is responsible for placing the conference call, shall provide the court via e-filing a call-in number in which the court may call to connect to the conference call. It is counsels obligation to supply the conference contact information to opposing counsel and the court. This can be placed on the docket under seal or supplied independently to opposing counsel and the court, in order to protect the privacy and security of the teleconference. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/4/21. (bs)
December 31, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Lewis Patterson, Patterson Supply Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lizzano, Kristen)
December 23, 2020 Filing 8 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Joseph M. DeMarco. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 12/23/20. (bs)
December 23, 2020 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kristen E. Lizzano on behalf of Lewis Patterson, Patterson Supply Company, Inc. Attorney Joseph DeMarco is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5400847.. (Lizzano, Kristen)
December 22, 2020 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Patterson Supply Company, Inc.. (Lizzano, Kristen)
December 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristen Lizzano on behalf of Lewis Patterson, Patterson Supply Company, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lizzano, Kristen)
December 18, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Edward J. Herron, IV. All Defendants. (Rodgers, John)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures.Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 11/23/20. (bs)
November 17, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Lewis Patterson, Patterson Supply Company, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ep)
November 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lewis Patterson, Patterson Supply Company, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number APAMDC-5348319), filed by Edward J. Herron, IV. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herron v. Patterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis Patterson
Represented By: Kristen E. Lizzano
Represented By: Joseph M. DeMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patterson Supply Company, Inc.
Represented By: Kristen E. Lizzano
Represented By: Joseph M. DeMarco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward J. Herron, IV
Represented By: Patrick Hughes
Represented By: Joseph Musto
Represented By: John P. Rodgers
Represented By: Joseph John Musto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?