Stephan Zouras LLP v. Marrone et al
Plaintiff: Stephan Zouras LLP
Defendant: Moremarrone LLC and Thomas More Marrone
Case Number: 3:2020cv02357
Filed: December 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Martin C Carlson
Referring Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2023 Filing 89 NOTICE by Stephan Zouras LLP re #88 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #78 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Stephan Zouras LLP, #79 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Moremarrone LLC, Thomas More Marrone Plaintiff's Notice of Concurrence (Cohen, David)
April 28, 2023 Filing 88 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #78 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Stephan Zouras LLP, #79 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Moremarrone LLC, Thomas More Marrone. Objections to R&R due by 5/12/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on April 27, 2023. (kjn)
March 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion to strike what aredescribed as the improper opinions set forth in the expert report of a potential defense witness, Michael Donovan, (Doc. #77 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renewal as a motion in limine at an appropriate time following the resolution of the pending summary judgment motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on March 23, 2023. (kjn)
March 13, 2023 Filing 86 REPLY BRIEF re #78 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Stephan Zouras LLP. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Issues, #2 Exhibit(s) A - Smiley DOL 3d Cir Appeal Docs)(Cohen, David)
March 13, 2023 Filing 85 REPLY BRIEF re #79 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC.(Heisner, Kyle)
March 7, 2023 Filing 84 REPLY BRIEF re #77 MOTION to Strike PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE IMPROPER OPINIONS IN MICHAEL DONOVANS EXPERT REPORT filed by Stephan Zouras LLP.(Cohen, David)
February 21, 2023 Filing 83 ANSWER TO STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2, #3 Exhibit(s) 3, #4 Exhibit(s) 4, #5 Exhibit(s) 5, #6 Exhibit(s) 6)(Heisner, Kyle)
February 21, 2023 Filing 82 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #78 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heisner, Kyle)
February 21, 2023 Filing 81 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #77 MOTION to Strike PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE IMPROPER OPINIONS IN MICHAEL DONOVANS EXPERT REPORT filed by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Heisner, Kyle)
February 20, 2023 Filing 80 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #79 First MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Stephan Zouras LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement Plaintiff's Statement of Genuine Issues, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Adecco Subpoena Response, #4 Exhibit(s) B - DuPont Subpoena Response, #5 Exhibit(s) C - Defendants' Initial Disclosures, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Plaintiff's Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #7 Exhibit(s) E - Cohen Dep. Tr.)(Cohen, David)
January 20, 2023 Filing 79 First MOTION for Summary Judgment by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC. (Attachments: #1 Statement Statement of Undisputed Material Facts In Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit(s) Exhibit 10)(Heisner, Kyle)
January 20, 2023 Filing 78 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Stephan Zouras LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo, #3 Supplement Statement of Undisputed Material Facts, #4 Exhibit(s) 1 - Cohen Dep Tr, #5 Exhibit(s) 1A - Cohen Dep Errata, #6 Exhibit(s) 2 - Marrone 7-18 Email, #7 Exhibit(s) 3 - Smiley 11-18 Retainers, #8 Exhibit(s) 4 - Zouras Dep Tr, #9 Exhibit(s) 5 - Smiley P Mediation Memo, #10 Exhibit(s) 6 - Marrone 10-20 Emails, #11 Exhibit(s) 7 - Marrone 12-20 Email, #12 Exhibit(s) 8 - Marrone 8-22 Letter, #13 Exhibit(s) 9 - Marrone Time Records, #14 Exhibit(s) 10 - Marrone Dep Tr)(Cohen, David)
January 20, 2023 Filing 77 MOTION to Strike PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO STRIKE IMPROPER OPINIONS IN MICHAEL DONOVANS EXPERT REPORT by Stephan Zouras LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Donovan Dec, #4 Exhibit(s) B - Donovan Dep Tr, #5 Exhibit(s) C - Donovan Report, #6 Exhibit(s) D1 - Presentation 1, #7 Exhibit(s) D2 - Presentation 2, #8 Exhibit(s) D3 - Presentation 3, #9 Exhibit(s) E - Def Mediation Memo)(Cohen, David)
October 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER approving #75 Joint Scheduling Stipulation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 28, 2022. (kjn)
October 28, 2022 Filing 75 STIPULATION re #74 Case Management Order - Standard Track,, Joint Scheduling Stipulation by Stephan Zouras LLP. (Cohen, David)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that theproposed revised case management plan is ADOPTED and the following schedulewill govern further proceedings in this case:1. Deadline for Defendants Production Pursuant to the September 1, 2022Order: October 3, 20222. All Expert Depositions Completed by: November 3, 20223. Deadline for Deposition of Thomas Marrone: November 3, 20224. Dispositive and Daubert Motions due: December 16, 20225. Consent to magistrate judge jurisdiction: December 16, 20226. Oppositions to Dispositive Motions due: January 16, 202327. Replies to Dispositive Motions: January 30, 2023 Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 15, 2022. (kjn)
September 15, 2022 Filing 73 UPDATED AND REVISED JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC, Stephan Zouras LLP. (kjn)
September 15, 2022 Filing 72 Letter to Magistrate Judge Carlson dated 9/14/2022 re: proposed pre-trial schedule. (kjn)
September 6, 2022 Filing 71 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Produce Documents, Information, or Objects Affidavit of Special Process Server served on Michael D. Donovan on August 31, 2022, filed by Stephan Zouras LLP. (Cohen, David)
September 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re #61 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery . It is hereby ORDERED that this motion is GRANTED and the defendants shall make a full and complete production ofdocuments responsive to Plaintiffs First Document Requests 11 and 14 within thirty days. To the extent that compliance with this order entails a search of electronically stored information, the parties are ORDERED to engage in the collaborative process outlined by the Court, consistent with the Sedona principles. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before September 14, 2022, the parties shall meet, confer, a provide the court with a proposed stipulated order setting a timetable for the completion of discovery and filing of any potentially dispositive motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 1, 2022. (kjn)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #64 MOTION to Compel Depositions filed by Moremarrone LLC, Thomas More Marrone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on August 31, 2022. (kjn)
August 28, 2022 Filing 68 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #64 MOTION to Compel Depositions filed by Stephan Zouras LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Heisner E-Mails, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - 30(b)(6) Notice)(Cohen, David)
August 26, 2022 Filing 67 REPLY BRIEF re #61 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS SECOND MOTION TO COMPEL filed by Stephan Zouras LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1 - Marrone Letter, #2 Exhibit(s) 2 - GPFF Time)(Cohen, David)
August 22, 2022 Filing 66 Second Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC.(Heisner, Kyle)
August 22, 2022 Filing 65 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #64 MOTION to Compel Depositions filed by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Heisner, Kyle)
August 22, 2022 Filing 64 MOTION to Compel Depositions by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Heisner, Kyle)
August 19, 2022 Filing 63 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #61 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery filed by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4, #6 Proposed Order)(Heisner, Kyle)
August 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS in its entirety; ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson. (See order for full details). Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 8/16/22. (bs)
August 5, 2022 Filing 61 Second MOTION to Compel Discovery , MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Stephan Zouras LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Marrone Dec, #4 Exhibit(s) B - Marrone Doc Responses)(Cohen, David)
July 15, 2022 Filing 60 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION - IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT the motion #54 to amend the defendants answer to dismiss the affirmative defense of set-off with prejudice should be granted. However, in the event that thiscourse leads to the filing of multiplicitous set-off claims by the Marrone defendants in other forums, the court should reserve the right to reconsider this ruling at the request of the Zouras firm. (See R&R for complete details.) Objections to R&R due by 7/29/2022 Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on 7/15/22. (ki)
July 13, 2022 Filing 59 WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney Sharon F. McKee terminated on behalf of Thomas More Marrone and MoreMarrone, LLC. (McKee, Sharon)
July 13, 2022 Filing 58 REPLY BRIEF re #54 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Answer with affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC.(Heisner, Kyle)
June 29, 2022 Filing 57 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #54 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Answer with affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Stephan Zouras LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proposed Stipulation, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Mieloch Dockets, #3 Exhibit(s) C - Lofts Dockets, #4 Exhibit(s) D - Gonzalez Dockets, #5 Proposed Order)(Cohen, David)
June 15, 2022 Filing 56 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #54 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Answer with affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKee, Sharon)
June 15, 2022 Filing 55 CERTIFICATE of Non-Concurrence by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC re #54 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Answer with affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint . (McKee, Sharon)
June 15, 2022 Filing 54 MOTION for Leave to File a Second Amended Answer with affirmative Defenses to Plaintiff's Complaint by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Proposed Second Amended Answer, #2 Exhibit(s) B - Redline, #3 Proposed Order)(McKee, Sharon)
June 14, 2022 Filing 53 WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE - Attorney David H. Colvin and Eric E. Reed terminated on behalf of Defendants Thomas More Marrone and MoreMarrone LLC. (Colvin, David)
June 13, 2022 Filing 52 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kyle Heisner on behalf of Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC Attorney Kyle Heisner is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5972590.. (Heisner, Kyle)
June 13, 2022 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon F. McKee on behalf of Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC (McKee, Sharon)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Final Date to Amend Pleadings: June 15, 2022.Close of Fact Discovery August 22, 2022. Expert Reports: Defendant August 22, 2022. Plaintiff rebuttal: September 21, 2022. Expert Depositions October 5, 2022. Dispositive Motions November 2, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on June 3, 2022. (kjn)
June 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER following a telephone conference withthe parties to address discovery disputes brought to the Courts attention in theparties correspondence (Docs. #42 , #43 , #44 ) regarding a number of outstandingdiscovery issues. The parties shall consult and confer regarding emails that have been withheldby all parties on the basis of privilege. On or before June 17, 2022, the partiesshall provide these emails to the Court for in camera review to determine ifthese documents are cloaked in privilege and have been properly withheld. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on June 3, 2022. (kjn)
May 27, 2022 Filing 47 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Joint) by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC. (Colvin, David)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 SCHEDULING ORDER - A Telephonic Case Management Conference is set for 6/3/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on May 9, 2022. (kjn)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER - SUSTAINING in part Dfts' objections #35 ; ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION of Magistrate Judge Carlson; DENYING plaintiff's motion for Preliminary Injunction #19 and REMANDING case to Magistrate Judge Carlson for further proceedings. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/11/22. (sm)
November 19, 2021 Filing 44 Letter from the Marrone Defendants in Reply to the Discovery Letter submitted by Plaintiff . (Colvin, David)
November 12, 2021 Filing 43 Letter from Plaintiff on outstanding discovery issues . (Cohen, David)
October 29, 2021 Filing 42 Letter from the Marrone Defendants regarding Discovery Disputes . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1-7 (attached to Marrone Defendants' Letter Brief regarding Discovery Disputes))(Colvin, David)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT - First, the dft shall submit a letter brief of no more than 10 pages outlining its position on its outstanding discovery issues by October 29, 2021. The pltf will respond to these discovery issues and raise any new matters pertaining to discovery from the pltfs perspective in a letter brief of similar length by November 12, 2021. The dft may then reply to any new matters in a letter brief of similar length by November 19, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on October 15, 2021. (kjn)
September 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the resolution of these discovery issuesshall be DEFERRED pending the outcome of the parties October 6, 2021 settlementconference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 21, 2021. (kjn)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 SCHEDULING ORDER - A Settlement Conference is set for 10/6/2021 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on July 30, 2021. (kjn)
July 1, 2021 Filing 36 NOTICE by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC of Service of Subpoena on Analytics Consulting (Served on June 15, 2021) (Colvin, David)
June 23, 2021 Filing 35 OBJECTION to #31 Report and Recommendations Filed by Defendants Thomas More Marrone and MOREMARRONE LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A to Limited Objections to R&R (Declaration of D. Cohen in Smiley action), #2 Exhibit(s) B to Limited Objections to R&R (Plaintiff Billing Records in Smiley action))(Colvin, David)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER re: the parties agreement to participate in an early mediation or settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on June 21, 2021. (kjn)
June 16, 2021 Filing 33 STATUS REPORT Regarding Early Mediation or Settlement Conference by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC. (Colvin, David)
June 10, 2021 Filing 32 NOTICE of Service of Discovery Subpoena , filed by Stephan Zouras LLP.(Cohen, David)
June 9, 2021 Filing 31 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs Motion for an Injunction Preventing the Dissipation of Assets and Preserving the Status Quo filed by Stephan Zouras LLP - IT IS RECOMMENDED THAT the plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 6/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on June 9, 2021. (kjn)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER following a telephone conference with the parties to address a number of discovery disputes brought to the Courts attention in the parties May 27, 2021 oral motions to compel discovery, (Docs. #28 , #29 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on June 2, 2021. (kjn)
June 2, 2021 Filing 29 Letter to Magistrate Judge Carlson / Oral MOTION to Compel by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC dated 5/27/2021.(kjn)
June 2, 2021 Filing 28 Letter to Magistrate Judge Carlson / Oral MOTION to Compel Discovery dated May 27, 2021 by Stephan Zouras LLP.(kjn)
April 23, 2021 Filing 26 SUR REPLY to REPLY to Response to Motion re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs Motion for an Injunction Preventing the Dissipation of Assets and Preserving the Status Quo filed by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC.(Colvin, David)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #23 Motion for Leave to File a sur-reply brief. Pltf may file a surrebuttal limited to issues raised to the sur-reply on or before 4/30/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on April 23, 2021. (kjn)
April 22, 2021 Filing 24 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #23 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction filed by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC.(Colvin, David)
April 22, 2021 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief in Further Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for a Preliminary Injunction by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) A (Proposed Sur-Reply Brief))(Colvin, David)
April 15, 2021 Filing 22 REPLY BRIEF re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs Motion for an Injunction Preventing the Dissipation of Assets and Preserving the Status Quo REPLY IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN INJUNCTION PREVENTING THE DISSIPATION OF ASSETS AND PRESERVING THE STATUS QUO filed by Stephan Zouras LLP.(Cohen, David)
April 7, 2021 Filing 21 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs Motion for an Injunction Preventing the Dissipation of Assets and Preserving the Status Quo filed by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A (Cohen to Marrone E-mail - 10.2.20), #2 Exhibit(s) B (Final Approval Order in Smiley - 10.2.20), #3 Exhibit(s) C (Marrone to Cohen E-mail - 10.2.20, #4 Exhibit(s) D (Cohen to Marrone E-mail - 10.3.20), #5 Exhibit(s) E (Marrone Memo ISO Motion to Distribute - 10.26.20), #6 Exhibit(s) F (Marrone Supp Memo ISO Motion to Distribute - 11.7.20), #7 Exhibit(s) G (Order in Smiley - 11.30.20), #8 Exhibit(s) H (Escrow Statement), #9 Exhibit(s) I (Affidavit of D. Siegel, Esq.))(Colvin, David)
March 29, 2021 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Concurrence and Compliance by Stephan Zouras LLP re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs Motion for an Injunction Preventing the Dissipation of Assets and Preserving the Status Quo . (Cohen, David)
March 24, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Plaintiffs Motion for an Injunction Preventing the Dissipation of Assets and Preserving the Status Quo by Stephan Zouras LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memo, #3 Exhibit(s) A - TM 7-26-18 E-Mail, #4 Exhibit(s) B - TM 10-4-20 E-Mail, #5 Exhibit(s) C - JZ 12-1-20 Letter, #6 Exhibit(s) D - TM 12-1-20 E-Mail, #7 Exhibit(s) E - Proposed Escrow Stip, #8 Exhibit(s) F - DC 3-8-20 E-Mail, #9 Exhibit(s) G - TM Supp Reply, #10 Exhibit(s) H - GPFF Injunction Briefs)(Cohen, David)
March 22, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION JOINT CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND STIPULATION by Stephan Zouras LLP. (Zouras, James)
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - Close of Fact Discovery: 8/31/2021. Mediation Notification: August 31, 2021. Plaintiff's Expert Reports are due by 8/31/2021. Defendant's Expert Reports are due by 9/30/2021. Dispositive Motions are due by 11/15/2021. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on February 22, 2021. (kjn)
February 11, 2021 Filing 15 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN (Joint) by Stephan Zouras LLP. (Zouras, James)
January 27, 2021 Filing 14 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Exhibit A (E-mails) and Exhibit B (Escrow Statement) by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC.(Colvin, David)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER - A Case Management Conference is set for 2/18/2021 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson. Joint case management plan due on or before 2/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on January 26, 2021. (kjn)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/26/21. (bs)
January 19, 2021 Filing 11 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to David Colvin. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/19/21. (bs)
January 19, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses and Exhibit A (Escrow Account Statement) by Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC.(Reed, Eric)
January 19, 2021 Filing 9 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by David H. Colvin on behalf of Thomas More Marrone, Moremarrone LLC Attorney David H. Colvin is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5436536.. (Colvin, David)
January 15, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephan Zouras LLP. Thomas More Marrone served on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/20/2021. (Cohen, David)
January 15, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephan Zouras LLP. Moremarrone LLC served on 12/31/2020, answer due 1/21/2021. (Cohen, David)
January 11, 2021 Filing 6 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Ryan Stephan. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/11/21. (bs)
January 11, 2021 Filing 5 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to James Zouras. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/11/21. (bs)
January 8, 2021 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Ryan F Stephan on behalf of Stephan Zouras LLP Attorney Ryan Stephan is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5421451.. (Stephan, Ryan)
January 6, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by James B Zouras on behalf of Stephan Zouras LLP Attorney James Zouras is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5417505.. (Zouras, James)
December 15, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (sm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/15/2020: #1 Summons Packet) (sm).
December 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5389287), filed by Stephan Zouras LLP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) 1, #3 Exhibit(s) 2, #4 Exhibit(s) 3, #5 Exhibit(s) 4)(sm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephan Zouras LLP v. Marrone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan Zouras LLP
Represented By: David J. Cohen
Represented By: James B Zouras
Represented By: Ryan F Stephan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moremarrone LLC
Represented By: Eric E. Reed
Represented By: David H. Colvin
Represented By: Kyle Heisner
Represented By: Sharon F. McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas More Marrone
Represented By: David H. Colvin
Represented By: Eric E. Reed
Represented By: Kyle Heisner
Represented By: Sharon F. McKee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?