Fenner v. Lehigh Valley Health Network
Plaintiff: Randolph S. Fenner
Defendant: Lehigh Valley Health Network d/b/a Lehigh Valley Hospital - Pocono
Case Number: 3:2021cv00075
Filed: January 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER : Counsel for Pltf is directed to file a brief in support of her argument that this court lacks subject matter jurisdiction; SEE ORDER FOR ALL INFO; Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/3/21. (ep)
March 2, 2021 Filing 21 Letter from Cynthia L. Pollick RE: JCM. (Pollick, Cynthia)
March 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER denying #19 Motion to Stay Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/2/21 (ep)
March 2, 2021 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay re #16 Letter, #5 Scheduling Order,, #15 Order, #13 Case Management Plan, #17 Objections, #18 Order the case management deadlines by Randolph S. Fenner. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pollick, Cynthia)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER STRIKING #17 Objections filed by Randolph S. Fenner Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 3/1/21. (ep)
February 28, 2021 Filing 17 *** STRICKEN per #18 Order of Court *** OBJECTIONS by Randolph S. Fenner. to #5 Scheduling Order,, . (Pollick, Cynthia) Modified on 3/1/2021 (ep).
February 26, 2021 Filing 16 Letter from Cynthia L. Pollick RE: JCM - 3/2/2021 at 10:30 am. (Pollick, Cynthia)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re #12 Letter. (See order for details). Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/17/21. (bs)
February 17, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY BRIEF re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with certificate of service filed by Lehigh Valley Health Network. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A-PHRC complaint, #2 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Keller, Eve)
February 13, 2021 Filing 13 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Randolph S. Fenner. (Pollick, Cynthia)
February 12, 2021 Filing 12 Letter from Cynthia L. Pollick RE: JCM requirements. (Pollick, Cynthia)
February 10, 2021 Filing 11 Documents deemed Rule 26 disclosures sent to Post & Schell by Randolph S. Fenner. . (Pollick, Cynthia)
February 8, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Eve R. Keller on behalf of Lehigh Valley Health Network (Keller, Eve)
February 8, 2021 Filing 9 EXHIBIT - Decisions by Randolph S. Fenner re #8 Brief in Opposition. (Attachments: #1 Hudnell case (Judge Pappert), #2 Lang case (Judge Conner))(Pollick, Cynthia)
February 8, 2021 Filing 8 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with certificate of service filed by Randolph S. Fenner. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Pollick, Cynthia)
January 29, 2021 Filing 7 Letter from Cynthia L Pollick RE: JCM scheduled from 3/2/2021 at 10:30 am - Call in number. (Pollick, Cynthia)
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT with certification of word count re #3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with certificate of service filed by Lehigh Valley Health Network. (Attachments: #1 Unpublished Opinion(s))(Kirshenbaum, Andrea)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 3/2/2021 10:30 AM before Honorable Malachy E Mannion. This conference will be held by telephone. Counsel for the plaintiff, who is responsible for placing the conference call, shall provide the court via e-filing a call-in number in which the court may call to connect to the conference call. It is counsels obligation to supply the conference contact information to opposing counsel and the court. This can be placed on the docket under seal or supplied independently to opposing counsel and the court, in order to protect the privacy and security of the teleconference. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/20/21. (bs)
January 19, 2021 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Lehigh Valley Health Network. (Kirshenbaum, Andrea)
January 19, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM with certificate of service by Lehigh Valley Health Network. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kirshenbaum, Andrea)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 1/13/21. (bs)
January 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lehigh Valley Health Network from Monroe County Court of Common Pleas, case number 6676cv2020. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5427389), filed by Lehigh Valley Health Network. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- State complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Affidavit of service, #3 Exhibit C- Notice to state court, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fenner v. Lehigh Valley Health Network
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lehigh Valley Health Network d/b/a Lehigh Valley Hospital - Pocono
Represented By: Alfred J. Johnston
Represented By: Andrea M. Kirshenbaum
Represented By: Eve R. Keller
Represented By: Glenn Guanowsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randolph S. Fenner
Represented By: Cynthia L. Pollick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?