Queen v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Wendy Queen
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2021cv00083
Filed: January 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendants shall file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 5/24/21. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 3/3/21 (jam)
February 17, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Concurrence)(Burns, Mark)
February 16, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark P Burns on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Burns, Mark)
February 15, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Dziak on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Dziak, Melissa)
February 15, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa A. Dziak on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Dziak, Melissa)
February 10, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wendy Queen. Johnson & Johnson served on 2/1/2021, answer due 2/22/2021. (Galpern, Michael)
February 10, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wendy Queen. Ethicon, Inc. served on 2/3/2021, answer due 2/24/2021. (Galpern, Michael)
January 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. You are directed to file a written report within 30 days as to whether service has been effected or a waiver of service obtained. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 1/22/21. (jam)
January 14, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
January 14, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5430638), filed by Wendy Queen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Queen v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon, Inc.
Represented By: Mark P Burns
Represented By: Melissa A. Dziak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Mark P Burns
Represented By: Melissa A. Dziak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Queen
Represented By: Michael A Galpern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?