Roldan v. Saul
Plaintiff: Marie Valentin Roldan
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2021cv00621
Filed: April 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Referring Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2021 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Honorable Robert D. Mariani and referred to Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr as one or more parties have not consented to the jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (jkc)
April 21, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Andrew Saul YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 5/21/2021 (ms)
April 21, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Marie Valentin Roldan YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 5/21/2021 (ms)
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Andrew Saul served on 4/16/2021, answer due 6/15/2021. (ga)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN OF SERVICE as to U.S. Attorney General of Summons & Complaint served on 4/16/21. (ga)
April 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Swauger on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Swauger, Melissa)
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney Scranton served on 4/14/2021, answer due 6/14/2021. (dw)
April 6, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). After you make service, you are further directed to file a Return of Service using the event Summons Returned Executed as to USA under the category Service of Process, in ECF. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Service Form, #2 USM 285 Service Form, #3 USM 285 Service Form) (ao)
April 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 4/6/21. (ms)
April 5, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals (ep)
April 5, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marie Valentin Roldan. (Attachments: #1 Atty Affidavit, #2 Application, #3 Proposed Order)(ep)
April 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Marie Valentin Roldan. (Attachments: #1 Verification, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roldan v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Melissa Swauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Valentin Roldan
Represented By: Stephen J. Hogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?