Empresas Victor Sinclair Dominicana S.A. v. Vintage Enterprises Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Empresas Victor Sinclair Dominicana S.A. doing business as Tabacalera Victor Sinclair
Defendant: Vintage Enterprises Inc. and Bernadette Arslanian
Case Number: 3:2021cv00744
Filed: April 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File an Answer or Motion to Complaint by Bernadette Arslanian, Vintage Enterprises Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reed, Michael)
June 8, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and the Complaint served on Vintage Enterprises, Inc. (Bernadette Arslanian, President) on June 4, 2021, filed by Empresas Victor Sinclair Dominicana S.A.. (Fineman, Stephanie)
June 8, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and the Complaint served on Bernadette Arslanian on June 4, 2021, filed by Empresas Victor Sinclair Dominicana S.A.. (Fineman, Stephanie)
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 4/26/21. (bs)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 Report re: Trademark AO Form 120. (ao)
April 23, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Bernadette Arslanian, Vintage Enterprises Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
April 23, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Empresas Victor Sinclair Dominicana S.A.. (ao)
April 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bernadette Arslanian, Vintage Enterprises Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5555710), filed by Empresas Victor Sinclair Dominicana S.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Empresas Victor Sinclair Dominicana S.A. v. Vintage Enterprises Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Empresas Victor Sinclair Dominicana S.A. doing business as Tabacalera Victor Sinclair
Represented By: Bridget A. Short
Represented By: Stephanie Beth Fineman
Represented By: Barry Schaevitz
Represented By: Cali R. Spota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vintage Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: Michael D. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette Arslanian
Represented By: Michael D. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?