Saracinaj v. Nationwide Insurance Co. et al
Plaintiff: Dano Saracinaj
Defendant: Robert Tuscano, Nationwide Insurance Co. doing business as Scottsdale Insurance Co. and Leslie Nester
Case Number: 3:2021cv00793
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2021 Filing 17 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Robert Tuscano. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance)(Morgenstern, John)
June 21, 2021 Filing 16 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nationwide Insurance Co..(Cummins, Nicholas)
June 18, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Leslie Nester.(Kessler, Andrew)
June 11, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Kessler on behalf of Leslie Nester (Kessler, Andrew)
June 7, 2021 Filing 13 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Dano Saracinaj. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Appendix, #3 Certificate of Service)(Rockman, Jeffrey)
June 7, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Robert Tuscano. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Morgenstern, John)
June 7, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE by Robert Tuscano re #1 Notice of Removal Consent to Removal (Morgenstern, John)
May 21, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John P. Morgenstern on behalf of Robert Tuscano (Morgenstern, John)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order approving #8 Joint Stipulation for Briefing Schedule Regarding Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. See Order for full details. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 5/20/21. (jam)
May 19, 2021 Filing 8 STIPULATION Joint for Briefing Schedule Regarding Defenfandant Nationwide's Motion to Dismiss (Track Changed) by Dano Saracinaj. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rockman, Jeffrey)
May 19, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey Rockman on behalf of Dano Saracinaj (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rockman, Jeffrey)
May 11, 2021 Filing 6 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Nationwide Insurance Co..(Cummins, Nicholas)
May 11, 2021 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Atty Cummins is advised to refile Brief in Support to Motion to Dismiss (Doc #5) as a separate docket entry under Responses and Replies (Briefs). (ao)
May 10, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Nationwide Insurance Co..(Cummins, Nicholas)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 5/5/21. (jam)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Leslie Nester Consent to Notice of Removal (Boyle, Kevin)
May 3, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Nationwide Insurance Co. identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Insurance Co.. (Cummins, Nicholas)
May 3, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nationwide Insurance Co. from Court of Common Pleas of Luzerne County, case number 2021-03396. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5564346), filed by Nationwide Insurance Co..(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saracinaj v. Nationwide Insurance Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Tuscano
Represented By: John P. Morgenstern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Insurance Co. doing business as Scottsdale Insurance Co.
Represented By: Nicholas A. Cummins
Represented By: Pamela A. Carlos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Nester
Represented By: Kevin W Boyle
Represented By: Andrew S. Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dano Saracinaj
Represented By: Louis F. Hornstine
Represented By: John B Lucas
Represented By: Jeffrey Rockman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?