Kehoe v. PA DOC Director of Food Services at Central Office et al
Plaintiff: John Kehoe
Defendant: Rev. Rainey, Rev. Klemm, Mr. Stuller, PA DOC Director of Food Services at Central Office and Ms. Spyker
Case Number: 3:2021cv00929
Filed: May 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 11 PROPOSED DOCUMENT re: Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint (ep)
July 9, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by John Kehoe.(ep)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Rev. Klemm, PA DOC Director of Food Services at Central Office, Rev. Rainey, Ms. Spyker, Mr. Stuller.(Enerson, Caleb)
July 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Rev. Klemm, PA DOC Director of Food Services at Central Office, Rev. Rainey, Ms. Spyker, Mr. Stuller. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Enerson, Caleb)
June 3, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Mehalchick in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion to Extend Time - The defendants shall file their responsive pleading within thirty days of this Order. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 6/3/2021 (cw)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 REQUEST to know who requested case be removed to Federal Court, and request for docket sheet; by John Kehoe. Copy of docket sent explaining that this one copy is free this time, but that regardless of in forma pauperis status, in the future his request would need to include payment of 10 cents per page and include a self-addressed stamped envelope. (ep)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by Rev. Klemm, PA DOC Director of Food Services at Central Office, Rev. Rainey, Ms. Spyker, Mr. Stuller.(Enerson, Caleb)
May 24, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to John Kehoe, Rev. Klemm, PA DOC Director of Food Services at Central Office, Rev. Rainey, Ms. Spyker, Mr. Stuller YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 6/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Direct Consent Form) (cw)
May 21, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (Attachments: #1 Instruction Sheet, #2 Fed & Local Rules) (lp)
May 21, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Mr. Stuller, Rev. Rainey, PA DOC Director of Food Services at Central Office, Ms. Spyker, Rev. Klemm from Court of Common Pleas of Huntingdon County, case number 2021-55. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5583856), filed by Mr. Stuller, Rev. Rainey, PA DOC Director of Food Services at Central Office, Ms. Spyker, Rev. Klemm. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Complaint, #3 Litigation Notice, #4 Summons, #5 Notice of Removal)(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kehoe v. PA DOC Director of Food Services at Central Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rev. Rainey
Represented By: Caleb Curtis Enerson
Represented By: Karen Mascio Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rev. Klemm
Represented By: Caleb Curtis Enerson
Represented By: Karen Mascio Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Stuller
Represented By: Caleb Curtis Enerson
Represented By: Karen Mascio Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PA DOC Director of Food Services at Central Office
Represented By: Caleb Curtis Enerson
Represented By: Karen Mascio Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ms. Spyker
Represented By: Caleb Curtis Enerson
Represented By: Karen Mascio Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Kehoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?