Kramer v. Saul
Plaintiff: Edward W. Kramer
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2021cv01078
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Mehalchick in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc)
July 23, 2021 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to USM2285 served on Attorney General on 7/22/21. (ga)
July 23, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Andrew Saul served on 7/22/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (ga)
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Edward W. Kramer, Andrew Saul YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 8/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Direct Consent Form) (cw)
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Judge on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Judge, Timothy)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed US Atty served on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (ao)
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Service Form) (ep)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 7/14/21. (ep)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals (ao)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edward W. Kramer.(ao)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Edward W. Kramer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kramer v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Timothy S. Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward W. Kramer
Represented By: Sharon Gornstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?