Asch v. Saul
Plaintiff: James Asch, Jr.
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 3:2021cv01163
Filed: June 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Referring Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 VERBAL ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Case reassigned to Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann and referred to Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick as one or more parties have not consented to the jurisdiction of a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (jkc)
July 23, 2021 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE upon U.S. Attorney General on 7/22/21. (dw)
July 23, 2021 Filing 9 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE upon Commissioner of Social Security on 7/22/21. (dw)
July 22, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to James Asch, Jr, Andrew Saul YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 8/23/2021 (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Direct Consent Form) (cw)
July 21, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa Swauger on behalf of Andrew Saul. (Swauger, Melissa)
July 20, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed US Atty served on 7/20/2021, answer due 9/20/2021. (ao)
July 14, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Andrew Saul and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Service Form) (ep)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 7/14/21. (ep)
June 30, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals (ao)
June 30, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Asch, Jr.(ao)
June 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by James Asch, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asch v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Melissa Swauger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Asch, Jr.
Represented By: Christopher J. Marzzacco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?