Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Yap et al
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Defendant: Tina Yap, Virginia Chan and Adventure Sports, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01236
Filed: July 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 20 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Syken, Marc)
August 30, 2021 Filing 19 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Tina Yap. (Attachments: #1 Memo Brief in Opposition, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Silverstein, Joseph)
August 30, 2021 Filing 18 REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss filed by Virginia Chan.(Partenheimer, Wayne)
August 27, 2021 Filing 17 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Virginia Chan.(Partenheimer, Wayne)
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order approving re #14 Stipulation Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 8/20/2021. (cw)
August 19, 2021 Filing 15 REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Syken, Marc)
August 18, 2021 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #6 MOTION to Remand of Plaintiff Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company by Virginia Chan. (Partenheimer, Wayne)
August 18, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE by Tina Yap Notice of Consent of Removal (Silverstein, Joseph)
August 17, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of of Non-Concurrence by Virginia Chan re #2 MOTION to Change Venue , #3 Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue. (Partenheimer, Wayne)
August 16, 2021 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #2 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Syken, Marc)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice to Defend and Complaint for Civil Damages and Declaratory Relief with Exhibits served on Defendant Tina Yap on 07/23/2021, filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Syken, Marc)
August 6, 2021 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION to Transfer Case or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss filed by Tina Yap.(Silverstein, Joseph)
August 6, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer Case or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss by Tina Yap. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #3 Certificate of Service)(Silverstein, Joseph)
August 6, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION to Remand filed by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Syken, Marc)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to Remand by Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #4 Certificate of Service)(Syken, Marc)
August 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc J. Syken on behalf of Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Syken, Marc)
August 5, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph B. Silverstein on behalf of Tina Yap (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Silverstein, Joseph)
August 2, 2021 Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Virginia Chan.(Partenheimer, Wayne)
August 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Change Venue by Virginia Chan. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A)(Partenheimer, Wayne)
July 14, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Tina Yap, Adventure Sports, Inc., Virginia Chan from Court of Common Pleas of Monroe County, case number 3245-cv-2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 5635337), filed by Tina Yap, Adventure Sports, Inc., Virginia Chan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Notice of Adverse Parties, #4 Proof of Mailing, #5 Exhibit(s))(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company v. Yap et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Louis A. Bove
Represented By: Marc J. Syken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tina Yap
Represented By: Wayne Partenheimer
Represented By: Joseph B. Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia Chan
Represented By: Wayne Partenheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adventure Sports, Inc.
Represented By: Wayne Partenheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?