Klapat v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Jamie N Klapat
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 3:2021cv01301
Filed: July 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Commissioner of Social Security, Jamie N Klapat YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 10/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Direct Consent Form) (cw)
September 9, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Judge on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security. (Judge, Timothy)
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to the U.S. Attorney on 9/1/21. (ga)
September 2, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jamie N Klapat. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/1/2021, answer due 11/1/2021. (ga)
September 2, 2021 Filing 6 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to Attorney General on 9/1/21. (ga)
August 25, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Service Form) (ep)
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED; Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 8/25/21. (ep)
July 23, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 12/11/13. (ga)
July 23, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jamie N Klapat.(ga)
July 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Jamie N Klapat. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) "A" - Notice of appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klapat v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie N Klapat
Represented By: Jamie Ryan Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Timothy S. Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?