West v. Kijakazi
Plaintiff: David A. West, Sr.
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Case Number: 3:2021cv01350
Filed: August 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2021 Filing 12 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Saporito in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc)
August 10, 2021 Filing 11 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed upon Commissioner of SSI (sm)
August 10, 2021 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed upon Atty General (sm)
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Kilolo Kijakazi YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 9/9/2021 (ms)
August 10, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to David A. West, Sr YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 9/9/2021 (ms)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy S. Judge on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. (Judge, Timothy)
August 6, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Kilolo Kijakazi served on 8/6/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (USM285 for process served on U.S. Atty Scranton) (ep)
August 4, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, SSA and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). After you make service, you are further directed to file a Return of Service using the event Summons Returned Executed as to USA under the category Service of Process, in ECF. (Attachments: #1 USM Service Form) (sm)
August 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. COMPLAINT IS DEEMED FILED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 8/4/21. (ms)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals (sm)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION (Application0 for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by David A. West, Sr.(sm)
August 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kilolo Kijakazi lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by David A. West, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(sm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: West v. Kijakazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. West, Sr.
Represented By: Noah G. Naparsteck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By: Timothy S. Judge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?