Sheats et al v. Ohio Security Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Dana S. Sheats and William F Sheets
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company, Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Ohio Casualty Corporations
Case Number: 3:2021cv01607
Filed: September 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 15 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #12 MOTION to Strike #6 Amended Complaint (All bad faith allegations in Count III as well as Plaintiffs request for counsel fees) filed by Dana S. Sheats, William F Sheets.(Westervelt, George)
November 10, 2021 Filing 14 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #12 MOTION to Strike #6 Amended Complaint (All bad faith allegations in Count III as well as Plaintiffs request for counsel fees) filed by LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Corporations, Ohio Security Insurance Company.(Smith, Robert)
November 2, 2021 Filing 13 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Mehalchick in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc)
November 1, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #6 Amended Complaint (All bad faith allegations in Count III as well as Plaintiffs request for counsel fees) by LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Corporations, Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Smith, Robert)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer LMHC Massachusetts Holdings answer due 11/1/2021; Liberty Mutual Group Inc. answer due 11/1/2021; Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc. answer due 11/1/2021; Liberty Mutual Insurance Company answer due 11/1/2021; Ohio Casualty Corporations answer due 11/1/2021; Ohio Security Insurance Company answer due 11/1/2021. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 10/28/2021 (cw)
October 22, 2021 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Corporations, Ohio Security Insurance Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (cw)
October 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #6 Amended Complaint by LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Corporations, Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Concurrence)(Smith, Robert)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER finding as moot #4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 10/13/2021 (cw)
October 7, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Corporations, Ohio Security Insurance Company and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (cw)
October 6, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ohio Security Insurance Company, filed by William F Sheets, Dana S. Sheats. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibits 1-6)(Westervelt, George)
October 4, 2021 Filing 5 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Corporations, Ohio Security Insurance Company.(Smith, Robert)
September 24, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Corporations, Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Smith, Robert)
September 20, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Liberty Mutual Group Inc., Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Corporations, Ohio Security Insurance Company, Dana S. Sheats, William F Sheets YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 10/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Defendants Direct Consent Form) (cw)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Ohio Security Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company, Corporate Parent The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Peerless Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Employers Insurance Company of Wausau, Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company and Employers Insurance Company of Wausau for Ohio Security Insurance Company. (sm)
September 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Liberty Mutual Group Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Ohio Security Insurance Company, Ohio Casualty Corporations from Monroe County, case number 4405Civil2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 5698877), (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- COMPLAINT)(sm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sheats et al v. Ohio Security Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dana S. Sheats
Represented By: George W. Westervelt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F Sheets
Represented By: George W. Westervelt, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LMHC Massachusetts Holdings
Represented By: Robert E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Group Inc.
Represented By: Robert E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Casualty Corporations
Represented By: Robert E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?