Walsh v. La Tolteca Wilkes Barre, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Defendant: La Tolteca Wilkes Barre, Inc. doing business as La Tolteca Authentic Mexican Restaurant and Carlos De Leon
Case Number: 3:2021cv01628
Filed: September 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2021 Filing 8 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Luis A. Santos. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 11/19/2021. (cw)
November 19, 2021 Filing 7 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Carlos De Leon, La Tolteca Wilkes Barre, Inc., Martin J. Walsh YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 12/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Direct Consent Form) (cw)
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Luis Santos on behalf of Carlos De Leon, La Tolteca Wilkes Barre, Inc. Attorney Luis Santos is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5763178.. (Santos, Luis)
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Martin J. Walsh. All Defendants. (Astorga, Bertha)
September 22, 2021 Filing 4 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Bertha Astorga Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 9/22/2021. (cw)
September 21, 2021 Filing 3 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Bertha M. Astorga on behalf of Martin J. Walsh Attorney Bertha Astorga is seeking special admission.. (Attachments: #1 Letter from agency superior)(Astorga, Bertha)
September 21, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Carlos De Leon, La Tolteca Wilkes Barre, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
September 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carlos De Leon, La Tolteca Wilkes Barre, Inc., filed by Martin J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Schedule A)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walsh v. La Tolteca Wilkes Barre, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin J. Walsh
Represented By: Bertha M. Astorga
Represented By: Maria del Pilar Castillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: La Tolteca Wilkes Barre, Inc. doing business as La Tolteca Authentic Mexican Restaurant
Represented By: Luis Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carlos De Leon
Represented By: Luis Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?