O'Donnell v. Tamaqua Transfer and Recycling, Inc.
Plaintiff: Thomas O'Donnell
Defendant: Tamaqua Transfer and Recycling, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01701
Filed: October 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark J. Gottesfeld on behalf of Thomas O'Donnell (Gottesfeld, Mark)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion to Extend Time - The defendant has until December 17, 2021 to file its response to the complaint. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 11/18/2021 (cw)
November 18, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Thomas O'Donnell, Tamaqua Transfer and Recycling, Inc. YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 12/20/2021 (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Direct Consent Form) (cw)
November 17, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to To File Response to Complaint by Tamaqua Transfer and Recycling, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenthal, Howard)
October 5, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Tamaqua Transfer and Recycling, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ga)
October 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Tamaqua Transfer and Recycling, Inc. ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number 5715977), filed by Thomas O'Donnell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Donnell v. Tamaqua Transfer and Recycling, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas O'Donnell
Represented By: Peter Winebrake
Represented By: Mark J. Gottesfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamaqua Transfer and Recycling, Inc.
Represented By: Howard A. Rosenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?