Selmon v. Quay et al
Petitioner: Timothy M. Selmon
Respondent: Warden Quay, Scott Biggers and Illegible Respondent
Case Number: 3:2021cv01714
Filed: October 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CA
Referring Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Extend Time. Respondent shall file an answer to the habeas petition on or before December 8, 2021. Petitioner shall be permitted to file, within 14 days of the date on which the answer is filed, a reply to the answer. See order for complete details. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 12/1/21. (dw)
December 1, 2021 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to one week extension until 12/8/21 to file a response by Warden Quay. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sanderson, Joanne)
November 29, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Hearing by Timothy M. Selmon.(dw)
November 18, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Discovery Abuse Sanctions by Timothy M. Selmon.(dw)
November 18, 2021 Filing 10 DOCUMENT FILED entitled Independent Report by Timothy M. Selmon. (dw)
November 12, 2021 Filing 9 Certified Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Timothy M. Selmon. (sm)
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 SHOW CAUSE ORDER and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus #1 Served on Warden Quay, US Attorney Scranton, US Attorney General, Washington, D.C. (dw)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; PETITION IS DEEMED FILED. Clerk of Court is directed to terminate Scott Biggers and the Federal Bureau of Prisons as Respondents in this action. See Order for details. Show Cause Response due by 12/1/2021. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 11/10/21. (dw)
October 22, 2021 Filing 6 FIFTEEN (15) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - Within 15 days of the date of this Order, the Warden or other appropriate official of the institution at which Plaintiff is currently incarcerated is directed to provide to the Court, under oath, or declare under penalty of perjury, a statement of the current balance in the Plaintiffs account and a record of the transactions in his account that have occurred with the preceding six (6) months. Order sent to Superintendent and petitioner. Signed by LP on 10/22/2021. (lp)
October 22, 2021 Filing 5 UNCERTIFIED Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Timothy M. Selmon. (dw)
October 22, 2021 Filing 4 UNCERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy M. Selmon.(dw)
October 7, 2021 Filing 3 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 10/07/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp)
October 7, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
October 7, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Timothy M. Selmon.(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Selmon v. Quay et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Timothy M. Selmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Quay
Represented By: Joseph J Terz
Represented By: Joanne M. Sanderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Biggers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Illegible Respondent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?