Thomas v. Little et al
Petitioner: Landon Wiley Thomas
Respondent: George Little and Pennsylvania Attorney General's Office
Case Number: 3:2021cv02159
Filed: December 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: DB
Referring Judge: Malachy E Mannion
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ELECTION ORDER: Notice of Election due by 4/8/2022; SEE IRDER FOR ALL INFO; Signed by Honorable Malachy E Mannion on 2/22/22. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Election Form)(ep)
December 30, 2021 Receipt of payment from LANDON THOMAS in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 12/29/2021. Receipt number 111027977 processed by prowe. (tp)
December 28, 2021 Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp)
December 28, 2021 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $5, Receipt Number 333), filed by Landon Wiley Thomas. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Transcript of Proceedings dated 02/05/2015, #2 Copy of Petitioner's Check for filing fee)(lp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Little et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Landon Wiley Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: George Little
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pennsylvania Attorney General's Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?