Etzle et al v. Glova et al
Plaintiff: Daniel Etzle and Lisa Etzle
Defendant: Raymond Glova and Nicholas Riebel
Case Number: 3:2022cv00139
Filed: January 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by D. Addison Murray on behalf of Nicholas Riebel (Murray, D. Addison)
March 8, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Rongaus on behalf of Nicholas Riebel (Rongaus, Andrew)
February 9, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Daniel Etzle, Lisa Etzle. Nicholas Riebel waiver sent on 1/27/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (Dyller, Barry)
February 7, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Daniel Etzle, Lisa Etzle. Raymond Glova waiver sent on 1/27/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (Dyller, Barry)
January 27, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Barry H. Dyller on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Dyller, Barry)
January 26, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Raymond Glova, Nicholas Riebel and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 MJ Pltf Packet) (ep)
January 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Raymond Glova, Nicholas Riebel ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-5827486), filed by Daniel Etzle, Lisa Etzle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Etzle et al v. Glova et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Etzle
Represented By: Theron J Solomon
Represented By: Barry H. Dyller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Etzle
Represented By: Theron J Solomon
Represented By: Barry H. Dyller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Raymond Glova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicholas Riebel
Represented By: Andrew M. Rongaus
Represented By: D. Addison Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?