Foy et al v. Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Ronald Foy and Gwen Foy
Defendant: Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2022cv00351
Filed: March 9, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 12/19/2022. Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 1/19/2023. Defendant Expert Report is due by 2/19/2023. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 4/15/2023. Motions due by 5/1/2023. Supplemental due by 3/15/2023. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 4/21/2022. (cw)
April 19, 2022 Filing 9 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Mehalchick in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2021-08. (jkc)
April 14, 2022 Filing 8 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company. (Smith, Robert)
March 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference set for 4/19/2022 10:00 AM before Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick. SEE ORDER FOR CALL-IN NUMBERS. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 3/21/2022. (cw)
March 16, 2022 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company.(Dapper, Kathleen)
March 16, 2022 Filing 5 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company, Gwen Foy, Ronald Foy YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU ARE NOT AN ECF REGISTERED USER, THEN MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 4/15/2022 (Attachments: #1 Defendant's Direct Consent Form) (cw)
March 14, 2022 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company. (Smith, Robert)
March 14, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Smith on behalf of Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company (Smith, Robert)
March 9, 2022 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation for Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company. (ao)
March 9, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company from Court of Common Pleas of Luzerne County, case number 2022-01103. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-5874740), filed by Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Cert of Service, #3 Exhibit(s) A, #4 Exhibit(s) B, #5 Exhibit(s) C)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foy et al v. Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Foy
Represented By: Peter J. Biscontini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gwen Foy
Represented By: Peter J. Biscontini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encompass Home and Auto Insurance Company
Represented By: Daniel J. Twilla
Represented By: Kathleen P Dapper
Represented By: Robert E. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?