Abington Kids Creative Learning Center, Inc. v. Utica National Insurance Group et al
Plaintiff: Abington Kids Creative Learning Center, Inc.
Defendant: Utica National Insurance Group, Utica National Assurance Company, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Republic-Franklin Insurance Company and Northeast Insurance
Case Number: 3:2022cv01095
Filed: July 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 16, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2023 Filing 33 NOTICE by Abington Kids Creative Learning Center, Inc. re #32 Notice, Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority (Ghilardi, Melinda)
January 6, 2023 Filing 32 NOTICE Supplemental Authority Supporting Motion to Dismiss, filed by Republic-Franklin Insurance Company, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Utica National Assurance Company, Utica National Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Fitzgerald, Eric)
December 21, 2022 Filing 31 NOTICE by Abington Kids Creative Learning Center, Inc. re #30 Notice of Supplemental Authority Supporting Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Mulcahey, John)
December 5, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE by Republic-Franklin Insurance Company, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Utica National Assurance Company, Utica National Insurance Group re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Fitzgerald, Eric)
November 14, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE by Republic-Franklin Insurance Company, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Utica National Assurance Company, Utica National Insurance Group re #3 MOTION to Dismiss (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Fitzgerald, Eric)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER finding as moot #10 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 9/14/2022 (cw)
August 26, 2022 Filing 26 REPLY BRIEF re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Utica National Assurance Company, Utica National Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fitzgerald, Eric)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Reset; granting #24 Motion to Continue -IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the oral argument scheduled for Wednesday, August 31, 2022 is RESCHEDULED to Wednesday, September 14, 2022 at 9:00 AM. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 8/24/2022 (cw)
August 24, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 9/14/2022 09:00 AM in Scranton before Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick. (cw)
August 23, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to Reset Oral Argument, MOTION to Continue by Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Utica National Assurance Company, Utica National Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Concurrence, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order)(Ladov, Hillary)
August 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order approving re #22 Stipulation of Dismissal, Northeast Insurance terminated. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 8/23/2022. (cw)
August 19, 2022 Filing 22 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Northeast Insurance Only by Abington Kids Creative Learning Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ghilardi, Melinda)
August 18, 2022 Filing 21 CONSENTS to Proceed Before US Magistrate Judge Mehalchick in Direct Assignment Cases pursuant to Standing Order 2022-19. (jkc)
August 18, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Document 20 deleted as it was filed in error. (jkc)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER finding as moot #12 Motion for Extension of Time to File - AND NOW, this 15th day of August, 2022, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for extension of time to respond to the defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. 12) is DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the oral argument scheduled for Wednesday, August 24, 2022 is RESCHEDULED to Wednesday, August 31, 2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom #6. Counsel is reminded that this matter has been directly assigned to the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge per Standing Order 2022-19. On July 19, 2022, consent forms were sent to the parties, to be returned on or before August 18, 2022. If the parties do not consent, per the Standing Order, this matter will be reassigned to a District Judge and oral argument will be cancelled. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 8/15/2022 (cw)
August 15, 2022 Set/Reset Hearings: Oral Argument set for 8/31/2022 10:00 AM in Scranton before Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick. (cw)
August 12, 2022 Filing 18 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Abington Kids Creative Learning Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits, #2 Certificate of Service)(Ghilardi, Melinda)
August 10, 2022 Filing 17 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Bryce L. Friedman Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 8/10/2022. (cw)
August 9, 2022 Filing 16 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Hillary N. Ladov on behalf of Republic-Franklin Insurance Company, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Utica National Assurance Company, Utica National Insurance Group Attorney Hillary N. Ladov and Eric A. Fitzgerald is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6024437. (Ladov, Hillary) (FILING FEE HAS BEEN REFUNDED, THIS IS A DUPLICATE PAYMENT.) Modified on 8/10/2022 (jw).
August 9, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Friedman is asked to refile page 4 with his signature, bar id and date on the signature block. Once this is refiled the court will take under consideration. Please refile as a document filed. (cw)
August 8, 2022 Filing 15 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Hillary N. Ladov on behalf of Republic-Franklin Insurance Company, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Utica National Assurance Company, Utica National Insurance Group Attorney Hillary N. Ladov is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6024097.. (Ladov, Hillary)
August 8, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Fitzgerald is asked to refile the Petition for Special Admission (Doc. 13) as a "Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice" which is found under Other Documents. This event will prompt you for payment. Once this is refiled the court will take under consideration. (cw)
August 5, 2022 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE of of Concurrence by Republic-Franklin Insurance Company, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Utica National Assurance Company, Utica National Insurance Group re #12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Utica Defs Motion to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ladov, Hillary)
August 4, 2022 Filing 13 Petition Pro Hac Vice , filed by Republic-Franklin Insurance Company, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Utica National Assurance Company, Utica National Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Statement)(Fitzgerald, Eric)
August 3, 2022 Filing 12 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Utica Defs Motion to Dismiss by Abington Kids Creative Learning Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #3 Certificate of Service)(Ghilardi, Melinda)
August 1, 2022 Filing 11 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Northeast Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Certificate of Service)(O'Neal, Stuart)
August 1, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Northeast Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service)(O'Neal, Stuart)
July 25, 2022 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Northeast Insurance. (O'Neal, Stuart)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that oral argument on the motion to dismiss (Doc. 3) will be held on Wednesday, August 24, 2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom #6 of the William J. Nealon Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 235 North Washington Ave., Scranton, Pennsylvania.This matter has been directly assigned to the undersigned United States Magistrate Judge per Standing Order 2022-19. On July 19, 2022, consent forms were sent to the parties, to be returned on or before August 18, 2022. If the parties do not consent, per the Standing Order, this matter will be reassigned to a District Judge and oral argument will be cancelled. Oral Argument set for 8/24/2022 10:00 AM in Scranton before Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick. Signed by Chief MJ Karoline Mehalchick on 7/22/2022. (cw)
July 21, 2022 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Republic-Franklin Insurance Company, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Utica National Assurance Company, Utica National Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B)(Ladov, Hillary)
July 21, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Ladov is asked to refile the Memo of Law (Doc 4) as a Brief in Support. Brief in Support can be found under responses and replies. (cw)
July 20, 2022 Filing 6 Praecipe Request for Argument . (Ladov, Hillary)
July 20, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Republic-Franklin Insurance Company, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Utica National Assurance Company, Utica National Insurance Group. (Ladov, Hillary)
July 20, 2022 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Republic-Franklin Insurance Company, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Utica National Assurance Company, Utica National Insurance Group re #3 MOTION to Dismiss . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s))(Ladov, Hillary)
July 20, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Republic-Franklin Insurance Company, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Utica National Assurance Company, Utica National Insurance Group. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ladov, Hillary)
July 19, 2022 Filing 2 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Abington Kids Creative Learning Center, Inc., Northeast Insurance, Republic-Franklin Insurance Company, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Utica National Assurance Company, Utica National Insurance Group YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 8/18/2022 (Attachments: #1 Defendants' Direct consent Form, #2 Defendant Northeast Insurance Consent Form) (cw)
July 14, 2022 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attys Fitzgerald and Ladov will be updating address in PACER. (ao)
July 13, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Utica National Assurance Company, Utica National Insurance Group, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Republic-Franklin Insurance Company from Court of Common Pleas of Lackawanna County, case number 22-cv-1154. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAMDC-6001267), filed by Utica National Assurance Company, Utica National Insurance Group, Utica Mutual Insurance Company, Republic-Franklin Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Abington Kids Creative Learning Center, Inc. v. Utica National Insurance Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abington Kids Creative Learning Center, Inc.
Represented By: Melinda C. Ghilardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utica National Insurance Group
Represented By: Eric A Fitzgerald
Represented By: Hillary N. Ladov
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utica National Assurance Company
Represented By: Eric A Fitzgerald
Represented By: Hillary N. Ladov
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Utica Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric A Fitzgerald
Represented By: Hillary N. Ladov
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Republic-Franklin Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric A Fitzgerald
Represented By: Hillary N. Ladov
Represented By: Scott R. Eberle
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northeast Insurance
Represented By: Stuart T. O'Neal, III
Represented By: William D. Murray
Represented By: Bryce L. Friedman
Represented By: Scott R. Eberle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?