VILLA et al v. CARGILL MEAT SOLUTIONS CORPORATION
Plaintiff: Jennifer Villa and Susan Davidson
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation
Case Number: 3:2022cv01321
Filed: August 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Robert D Mariani
Referring Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2022 Filing 22 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER - STANDARD CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK. ORDERED THAT: Motions to join additional parties and/or amend pleadings shall be filed by 12/30/22. Establishment of additional case management deadlines will be deferred until after resolution of the class action certification motion. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 10/18/22. (jam)
October 13, 2022 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Susan Davidson, Jennifer Villa. (Winebrake, Peter)
September 30, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Cortes on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Cortes, Daniel)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Conference VIA TELEPHONE set for 10/17/2022 11:20 AM before Honorable Robert D. Mariani.The placement of the telephone conference call is the responsibility of the plaintiff. The completed Joint Case Management Plan must be filed at least 3 business days prior to the Case Management Conference. Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/22/22. (jam)
September 21, 2022 Filing 17 SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Jeremy Glenn Signed by Honorable Robert D. Mariani on 9/21/22. (jam)
September 20, 2022 Filing 16 Supplement by Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation. to #15 Petition for Special Admission - Pro Hac Vice . (Glenn, Jeremy)
September 15, 2022 Filing 15 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Jeremy J. Glenn on behalf of Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation Attorney Jeremy Glenn is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-6061006.. (Glenn, Jeremy)
August 23, 2022 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Marielle R. Macher on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Macher, Marielle)
August 23, 2022 Filing 13 Docket Sheet from the Eastern District of PA., Case filed 8/2/22; 2:22cv3035. (sm)
August 23, 2022 Filing 12 Case transferred electronically in from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:22-cv-03035 containing electronic documents. SM
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/22/22. 8/22/22 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2022.]
August 19, 2022 Filing 10 Memorandum of Law in Support of Transfer of Venue to the Middle District of Pennsylvania by CARGILL MEAT SOLUTIONS CORPORATION. (MALLOY, ELIZABETH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2022.]
August 18, 2022 Filing 9 Letter dated 8/18/22 Responding to the Court's 8/10/22 Order by SUSAN DAVIDSON, JENNIFER VILLA. (WINEBRAKE, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2022.]
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER THAT NO LATER THAN 8/26/22 THE PARTIES SHALL EACH SUBMIT A MEMORANDUM OF LAW SHOWING CAUSE WHY THIS ACTION SHOULD NOT BE TRANSFERRED TO THE U.S. DISTRICT COURT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. SIGNED BY HONORABLE TIMOTHY J. SAVAGE ON 8/10/22. 8/10/22 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2022.]
August 9, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by JASON A. CABRERA on behalf of CARGILL MEAT SOLUTIONS CORPORATION with Certificate of Service(CABRERA, JASON) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2022.]
August 9, 2022 Filing 6 Defendant, Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation's ANSWER to Complaint by CARGILL MEAT SOLUTIONS CORPORATION.(MALLOY, ELIZABETH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2022.]
August 8, 2022 Filing 5 Original Record together with certified copy of docket entries received from Court of Common Pleas of Philadelphia County. (ke) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2022.]
August 3, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by KRYSTEN CONNON on behalf of SUSAN DAVIDSON, JENNIFER VILLA (CONNON, KRYSTEN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2022.]
August 3, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by MICHELLE TOLODZIECKI on behalf of SUSAN DAVIDSON, JENNIFER VILLA (TOLODZIECKI, MICHELLE) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2022.]
August 3, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by PETER D. WINEBRAKE on behalf of SUSAN DAVIDSON, JENNIFER VILLA (WINEBRAKE, PETER) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2022.]
August 2, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CARGILL MEAT SOLUTIONS CORPORATION (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BPAEDC-16083100), filed by CARGILL MEAT SOLUTIONS CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Exhibit 1 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 - Affidavit of Service on Cargill, #5 Exhibit 3 - Class Action Initiation Order, #6 Exhibit 4 - Answer and New Matter to the Complaint, #7 Exhibit 5 - Case Management Order of January 18, 2022, #8 Exhibit 6 - Response of Plaintiff to New Matter, along with Plaintiff's Praecipe to Attach Verification to Response to New Matter, #9 Exhibit 7 - Order admitting Jeremy Glenn pro hac vice, #10 Exhibit 8 - Stipulated Protective Order, #11 Exhibit 9 - First Amended Complaint, #12 Exhibit 10 - Stipulation for First Amended Complaint, #13 Exhibit 11 - Praecipe to Attach Verification of Susan Davidson, #14 Exhibit 12 - Praecipe to Attach Verification of Jennifer Villa, #15 Certificate of Service)(MALLOY, ELIZABETH) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 8/23/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: VILLA et al v. CARGILL MEAT SOLUTIONS CORPORATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Villa
Represented By: Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Daniel Cortes
Represented By: Krysten Leigh Connon
Represented By: Peter Winebrake
Represented By: Sarah Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Krysten Connon
Represented By: Marielle R. Macher
Represented By: Michelle Tolodziecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Davidson
Represented By: Sarah R. Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Daniel Cortes
Represented By: Krysten Leigh Connon
Represented By: Peter Winebrake
Represented By: Sarah Schalman-Bergen
Represented By: Krysten Connon
Represented By: Marielle R. Macher
Represented By: Michelle Tolodziecki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cargill Meat Solutions Corporation
Represented By: Jeremy J. Glenn
Represented By: Jason A. Cabrera
Represented By: Elizabeth A. Malloy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?