Slack v. Office of Attorney General et al
Plaintiff: Joseph John Slack
Defendant: Office of Attorney General, Robert McHugh, Erik L. Olsen, Brian M. Zarallo, Pennsylvania State Police and Michael J. Mulvey
Case Number: 3:2022cv01501
Filed: September 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2022 Filing 7 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Robert McHugh, Michael J. Mulvey, Office of Attorney General, Erik L. Olsen, Brian M. Zarallo YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 12/22/2022 (ms)
November 22, 2022 Filing 6 CONSENT FORM SENT (For Direct Assignment Cases to Magistrate Judges) to Joseph John Slack YOU MUST SAVE THIS FORM TO YOUR DESKTOP. THEN OPEN THE SAVED FORM AND COMPLETE THE REQUIRED SECTIONS. DO NOT FILE THIS FORM IN THE CLERKS OFFICE. THE COMPLETED FORM MUST BE E-MAILED TO consents@pamd.uscourts.gov OR IF YOU DO NOT HAVE AN E-MAIL ACCOUNT YOU MAY MAIL THE FORM TO Clerks Administrative Assistant, Clerks Office, P.O. Box 1148, Scranton, PA 18501-1148. Consent Form due by 12/22/2022 (ms)
November 21, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Brian M. Zarallo, Robert McHugh, Erik L. Olsen, Michael J. Mulvey, Office of Attorney General. Brian M. Zarallo waiver sent on 10/14/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Robert McHugh waiver sent on 10/14/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Erik L. Olsen waiver sent on 10/14/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Michael J. Mulvey waiver sent on 10/14/2022, answer due 12/13/2022; Office of Attorney General waiver sent on 10/14/2022, answer due 12/13/2022. (DiTomo, Nicole)
November 21, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Katherine M. Yarish on behalf of Robert McHugh, Michael J. Mulvey, Office of Attorney General, Erik L. Olsen, Brian M. Zarallo (Yarish, Mary Katherine)
November 21, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicole R DiTomo on behalf of Robert McHugh, Michael J. Mulvey, Office of Attorney General, Erik L. Olsen, Brian M. Zarallo (DiTomo, Nicole)
September 26, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Robert McHugh, Michael J. Mulvey, Office of Attorney General, Erik L. Olsen, Pennsylvania State Police, Brian M. Zarallo and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ao)
September 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Robert McHugh, Michael J. Mulvey, Office of Attorney General, Erik L. Olsen, Pennsylvania State Police, Brian M. Zarallo ( Filing fee $402, Receipt Number APAMDC-6070264), filed by Joseph John Slack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ao)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slack v. Office of Attorney General et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph John Slack
Represented By: Sal Cognetti, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah R Lloyd
Represented By: Vincent S. Cimini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Attorney General
Represented By: Mary Katherine M. Yarish
Represented By: Nicole R DiTomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert McHugh
Represented By: Mary Katherine M. Yarish
Represented By: Nicole R DiTomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik L. Olsen
Represented By: Mary Katherine M. Yarish
Represented By: Nicole R DiTomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian M. Zarallo
Represented By: Nicole R DiTomo
Represented By: Mary Katherine M. Yarish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania State Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J. Mulvey
Represented By: Mary Katherine M. Yarish
Represented By: Nicole R DiTomo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?