Sartoris v. Primecare Medical CEO and Staff et al
Plaintiff: Edward Sartoris
Defendant: Primecare Medical CEO and Staff, Warden, Safety Officer and Maintenance Chief/Supervisor
Case Number: 3:2023cv00640
Filed: April 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CA
Referring Judge: Robert D Mariani
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2023 Receipt of payment from EDWARD SARTORIS in the amount of $60.26 for Civil Filing Fee/PLRA/CCAM. Transaction posted on 6/9/2023. Receipt number 333105042 processed by GR. (jjs)
June 7, 2023 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Warden. Warden waiver sent on 5/5/2023, answer due 7/5/2023. (Geiger, Gerard)
June 7, 2023 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Primecare Medical CEO and Staff.(Ninosky, John)
June 7, 2023 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's Complaint by Primecare Medical CEO and Staff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Ninosky, John)
June 7, 2023 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Primecare Medical CEO and Staff. Primecare Medical CEO and Staff waiver sent on 5/5/2023, answer due 7/5/2023. (Ninosky, John)
June 7, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John R. Ninosky on behalf of Primecare Medical CEO and Staff (Ninosky, John)
June 2, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard J. Geiger on behalf of Warden (Geiger, Gerard)
May 12, 2023 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Edward Sartoris.(sm)
May 8, 2023 Filing 9 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399)l and Copy of Complaint Mailed to All Defendants Waiver of Service due by 6/7/2023. (sm)
May 5, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER- Granting Application #6 to Proceed IFP; and DISMISSING the application to proceed IFP #2 ; The Complaint is deemed FiLED; DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO SEND this Order to the Warden/Superintendent where the plaintiff is confined AND DIRECTING the Clerks Office to send AO 398 AND 399 WAIVERS FORMS to defendants. Signed by Honorable Robert D Mariani on 5/4/23. (sm)
May 4, 2023 Filing 7 Uncertified Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Edward Sartoris. (sm)
May 4, 2023 Filing 6 Certified MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edward Sartoris.(sm)
April 17, 2023 Filing 5 (THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER) directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by EA on 04/17/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP (Civil Rights)) (ea)
April 17, 2023 Filing 4 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 AO 85 Notice & Consent Form, #2 Instructions for AO 398 and AO 399 Forms, #3 AO 398 and 399 Waiver Forms, #4 Federal & Local Rules) (ea)
April 17, 2023 Filing 3 AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff. (Forms are not completed correctly) (ea)
April 17, 2023 Filing 2 UNCERTIFIED MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edward Sartoris. (ea)
April 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Maintenance Chief/Supervisor, Primecare Medical CEO and Staff, Safety Officer, Warden lodged pending the disposition of the Motion for In Forma Pauperis, filed by Edward Sartoris. (ea)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sartoris v. Primecare Medical CEO and Staff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Sartoris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Primecare Medical CEO and Staff
Represented By: John R. Ninosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Represented By: Gerard J. Geiger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety Officer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maintenance Chief/Supervisor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?