Hopkins v. Petrucci et al
Plaintiff: Almon Hopkins
Defendant: James Petrucci, Jason Hyler and Kyle Gilmartin
Case Number: 3:2023cv01675
Filed: October 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Letter to the Court re status of case from Almon Hopkins. (ea)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - it is ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint on or before 12/22/2023. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint, this case will proceed based on the original complaint (Doc. 1). Plaintiff is advised that the failure to file an amended complaint may result in the dismissal of this action. (2) The Clerk of Court is directed to mail Plaintiff a blank civil complaint form along with this order. PLEASE SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 11/20/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Complaint form)(caw)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - it is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's certified application for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Doc. 7) is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall pay the full filing fee of $350.00, based on the financial information provided in the Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. The full filing fee shall be paid regardless of the outcome of the litigation. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a copy of this Order to the Warden of the institution wherein Plaintiff is presently confined. The Complaint (Doc. 1) is DEEMED filed. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2), the Court shall conduct a preliminary review of Plaintiff's complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 11/20/2023. (caw)
November 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CERTIFIED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Almon Hopkins. (ea)
October 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - it is ORDERED that: (1) Plaintiff's petition to proceed in forma pauperis #5 is DENIED. (2) Plaintiff is directed to do one of the following on or before 11/13/2023: fully complete and submit the correct application to proceed in forma pauperis; or tender payment in the amount of $402.00 to the Clerk of Court. Failure to comply with this order may result in the dismissal of this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 10/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Application for IFP) (caw)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Petition to proceed in forma pauperis (not on this Court's form) by Almon Hopkins.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed order)(lp)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 10/10/2023. (Attachments: #1 IFP (civil rights))(lp)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER. (nr)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number. (nr)
October 10, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kyle Gilmartin, Jason Hyler, James Petrucci lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Almon Hopkins.(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopkins v. Petrucci et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Almon Hopkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Petrucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Hyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Gilmartin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?