Godlewski v. Alvear Gonzalez, et al.
Plaintiff: Philip Godlewski
Defendant: Eduardo Nicolas Alvear Gonzalez, Good Lion Films, L.L.C. and Good Lion TV, L.L.C.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00344
Filed: February 28, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Julia K Munley
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 25, 2024 Filing 22 AMENDED COMPLAINT Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint against All Defendants, filed by Philip Godlewski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s))(Kolman, Timothy)
April 23, 2024 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Philip Godlewski.(Bowers, Timothy)
April 9, 2024 Filing 20 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Defendants filed by Eduardo Nicolas Alvear Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Brief in Opposition, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D)(Campbell, Ryan)
April 9, 2024 Filing 19 BRIEF IN SUPPORT of Defendants' re #16 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eduardo Nicolas Alvear Gonzalez.(Campbell, Ryan)
April 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to File Br/Support exceeding the maximum word limits- not to exceed 8500 words. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 4/9/24 (sm)
April 9, 2024 Filing 17 First MOTION for Leave to File Brief Not to Exceed 8,500 Words by Eduardo Nicolas Alvear Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Campbell, Ryan)
April 4, 2024 Filing 16 First MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Lack of Jurisdiction by Eduardo Nicolas Alvear Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Affidavit, #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s), #5 Exhibit(s), #6 Exhibit(s), #7 Exhibit(s), #8 Exhibit(s), #9 Exhibit(s), #10 Exhibit(s), #11 Exhibit(s), #12 Exhibit(s), #13 Exhibit(s), #14 Exhibit(s), #15 Exhibit(s))(Campbell, Ryan)
March 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File -Response to complaint due 4/5/24; Response to M/PI due 4/11/24 Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 3/29/24 (sm)
March 28, 2024 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responses by Eduardo Nicolas Alvear Gonzalez. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Nonconcurrence)(Rothenberg, Howard)
March 27, 2024 Filing 13 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Philip Godlewski. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kolman, Timothy)
March 27, 2024 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Philip Godlewski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Affidavit of Military/Nonmilitary Service, #2 Proposed Order)(Kolman, Timothy)
March 27, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by David Rothenberg on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Rothenberg, David)
March 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying #9 Motion for Default Judgment as premature and improperly filed. Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 3/27/24 (sm)
March 26, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to by Philip Godlewski.(Kolman, Timothy)
March 26, 2024 Filing 8 Praecipe PRAECIPE TO REMOVE DEFENDANT . (Kolman, Timothy)
March 19, 2024 Filing 7 EXHIBITS (2 Audio recordings) by Philip Godlewski re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . (2 CD-r scanned clean for malware; one forwarded to Chambers, one retained in Scr Clerk's Office); (ep)
March 11, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philip Godlewski. Good Lion TV, L.L.C. served on 3/4/2024, answer due 3/25/2024. (Kolman, Timothy)
March 8, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Philip Godlewski. (Attachments: #1 Memo MEMO OF LAW, #2 Exhibit(s) EXHIBIT 1, #3 Proposed Order)(Kolman, Timothy)
March 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 3/6/24. (sm)
March 5, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Philip Godlewski. Eduardo Nicolas Alvear Gonzalez served on 3/4/2023, answer due 3/25/2023. (Kolman, Timothy)
February 28, 2024 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Eduardo Nicolas Alvear Gonzalez, Good Lion Films, L.L.C., Good Lion TV, L.L.C. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (cp)
February 28, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Eduardo Nicolas Alvear Gonzalez, Good Lion Films, L.L.C., Good Lion TV, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $405, Receipt Number APAMDC-6561152), filed by Philip Godlewski. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(cp)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Godlewski v. Alvear Gonzalez, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip Godlewski
Represented By: Timothy A Bowers
Represented By: Timothy M. Kolman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eduardo Nicolas Alvear Gonzalez
Represented By: David Rothenberg
Represented By: Howard A Rothenberg
Represented By: Ryan Patrick Campbell, I
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Lion Films, L.L.C.
Represented By: David Rothenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Good Lion TV, L.L.C.
Represented By: David Rothenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?