Yancheck v. WS Asset Management, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Yancheck
Defendant: WS Asset Management, Inc. a/k/a WS Development d/b/a Highland Crossing, Sam's Club East, Inc. d/b/a Sam's Club, Lorraine Shemanski, Sam's Real Estate Business Trust, Kohl's, Inc. d/b/a KOHL'S, Divisions Maintenance Group, Inc., Divisions, Inc. d/b/a Division Maintenance Group, W/S/S Wilkes-Barre Properties BB Limited Partnership, W/S/S Wilkes-Barre Properties OP Limited Partnership, WS Asset Management, Inc. agent of WS Development d/b/a Highland Crossing, Sam's Club East, Inc., Kohl's, Inc. and Divisions, Inc.
Cross Defendant: WS Asset Management, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2024cv00409
Filed: March 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Julia K Munley
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2024 Filing 16 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #10 MOTION to Remand to State Court , #11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Sam's Club East, Inc., Sam's Real Estate Business Trust, Lorraine Shemanski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Alexander, Paul)
May 3, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Yancheck. Divisions Maintenance Group, Inc. served on 3/19/2024, answer due 4/9/2024. (Daly, Kane)
May 3, 2024 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Original Doc. 16 DELETED, to be refiled; (ep)
April 24, 2024 Filing 14 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, CROSSCLAIM against W/S/S Wilkes-Barre Properties BB Limited Partnership, W/S/S Wilkes-Barre Properties OP Limited Partnership, WS Asset Management, Inc. by Sam's Real Estate Business Trust, Sam's Club East, Inc., Lorraine Shemanski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s))(Blazure, Ryan)
April 23, 2024 Filing 13 DEFENDANTS ANSWER to Complaint WITH NEW MATTER by WS Asset Management, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kessler, Andrew)
April 19, 2024 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support re #11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court , filed by Lisa Yancheck. Related document: #11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Lisa Yancheck.(Rosenfeld, Rachel)
April 19, 2024 Filing 11 First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lisa Yancheck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit(s) Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit(s) Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit(s) Exhibit E)(Rosenfeld, Rachel)
April 17, 2024 Per telephone discussion with Atty Rosenfeld, Pltf's Brief in Support of #10 Motion to Remand will be filed separately; Clerk's Office DELETED Doc. 9, which was refiled as Doc #10 ; (ep)
April 11, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Lisa Yancheck. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Memo Memo, #3 Exhibit(s) Exhibits)(Rosenfeld, Rachel)
April 9, 2024 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint & Discovery served on Sam's Real Estate Business Trust on 02/26/2024, filed by Lisa Yancheck. (Daly, Kane)
April 5, 2024 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Vicencio is directed to file for special admission or make arrangements to be generally admitted. (ea)
April 4, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Vicencio on behalf of W/S/S Wilkes-Barre Properties BB Limited Partnership, W/S/S Wilkes-Barre Properties OP Limited Partnership (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Vicencio, Lauren)
April 4, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew S. Kessler on behalf of W/S/S Wilkes-Barre Properties BB Limited Partnership, W/S/S Wilkes-Barre Properties OP Limited Partnership (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kessler, Andrew)
April 1, 2024 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Kohl's, Inc..(Vilardi, Salvatore)
March 26, 2024 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #3 Attorney Appearance - Entry of Appearance by Paul Alexander on behalf of Sam's Club East, Inc., Sam's Real Estate Business Trust, Lorraine Shemanski (Alexander, Paul)
March 26, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Alexander on behalf of Sam's Club East, Inc., Sam's Real Estate Business Trust, Lorraine Shemanski (Alexander, Paul)
March 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures Signed by Honorable Julia K Munley on 3/8/24. (sm)
March 8, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sam's Real Estate Business Trust, Sam's Club East, Inc., Lorraine Shemanski from Philadelphia County Court of Common Pleas, case number 240200993. (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAMDC-6571221), filed by Sam's Real Estate Business Trust, Sam's Club East, Inc., Lorraine Shemanski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Philadelphia County Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(ep)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yancheck v. WS Asset Management, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Yancheck
Represented By: Marc I. Simon
Represented By: Rachel Rosenfeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WS Asset Management, Inc. a/k/a WS Development d/b/a Highland Crossing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's Club East, Inc. d/b/a Sam's Club
Represented By: Ryan C. Blazure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorraine Shemanski
Represented By: Ryan C. Blazure
Represented By: Paul Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: Ryan C. Blazure
Represented By: Paul Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's, Inc. d/b/a KOHL'S
Represented By: Salvatore A. Vilardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Divisions Maintenance Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Divisions, Inc. d/b/a Division Maintenance Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W/S/S Wilkes-Barre Properties BB Limited Partnership
Represented By: Andrew S. Kessler
Represented By: Lauren Vicencio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W/S/S Wilkes-Barre Properties OP Limited Partnership
Represented By: Andrew S. Kessler
Represented By: Lauren Vicencio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WS Asset Management, Inc. agent of WS Development d/b/a Highland Crossing
Represented By: Andrew S. Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's Club East, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan C. Blazure
Represented By: Paul Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl's, Inc.
Represented By: Salvatore Vilardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Divisions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross defendant: WS Asset Management, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew S. Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?