Cardona v. Bledsoe
Petitioner: Jose Cristobal Cardona
Respondent: B. A. Bledsoe
Case Number: 4:2010cv02269
Filed: November 2, 2010
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: SF
Presiding Judge: James F. McClure
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), DENYING 47 MOTION for Relief from Judgment filed by Jose Cristobal Cardona.Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 06/16/14. (sm)
June 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM and ORDER overruling the objections to the R&R ; adopting 40 Report and Recommendation of Chief Magistrate Judge Carlson; and DENYING petioner's motion for relief from judgment 38 . Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 6/24/13 (sm)
June 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MEMORANDUM and ORDER denying 26 28 Petitioner's Motions for Reconsideration. Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 6/19/12 (sm, )
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM and ORDER DENYING petition for writ of habeas corpus; DENYING petitioner's motions to supplement the petition; Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE case. Signed by Honorable James M. Munley on 7/6/11. (sm, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cardona v. Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Cristobal Cardona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: B. A. Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?