Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC v. 101 Acres, and 41,342 Sq. Ft More or Less in Heidelberg Township, York County, Pennsylvania, Located on Tax ID# 30000EE01600000000, Owned By Bradley E. Herr and Elizabeth M. Herr et al

Plaintiff: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Defendant: 101 Acres, and 41,342 Sq. Ft More or Less in Heidelberg Township, York County, Pennsylvania, Located on Tax ID# 30000EE01600000000, Owned By Bradley E. Herr and Elizabeth M. Herr, Bradley E. Herr and Elizabeth M. Herr
Case Number: 4:2013cv00783
Filed: March 26, 2013
Court: Pennsylvania Middle District Court
Office: Williamsport Office
County: York
Presiding Judge: Matthew W. Brann
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717 Natural Gas Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2016 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (MEMORANDUM filed previously as separate docket entry): Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony Based on False Extraordinary Assumptions, 119 is DENIED. Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony and Evidence of Plaintiffs Expe rt Witness 115 is DENIED. Defendants' Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Witnesses 117 is DENIED.Plaintiff's Motion to Exclude Improper Lay Opinion and Other Testimony by Defendants 121 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART.Plaintiff& #039;s Motion to Exclude Testimony relating to Fear of Pipelines 113 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART.At the request of the parties, the Court has decided the following two issues as a matter of law and will instruct the jury accordingly: The date of the taking was 12/9/2014. The rights taken included the Right-of-Way documents appended to the Complaints in Condemnation. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/26/16. (km)
May 20, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: In accordance with the Memorandum filed this date as separate docket entry no. 65, IT IS ORDERED THAT: Plaintiff's motion to alter or amend judgment in 4:13-cv-00783 (ECF No. 47) is DENIED; defendants's motion at ECF No. 60 is DENIED as moot; and plaintiff's motion at ECF No. 64 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/20/14. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/20/14. (km)
October 24, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/24/13: motion of Columbia Gas Transmission LLC motion for partial summary judgment DENIED; telephone status conference in this matter is scheduled for 11/5/2013 at 10:00 am. Plaintiffs counsel shall initiate call. Court may be reached at 570-323-9772. (lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC v. 101 Acres, and 41,342 Sq. Ft More or Less in Heidelberg Township, York County, Pennsylvania, Located on Tax ID# 30000EE01600000000, Owned By Bradley E. Herr and Elizabeth M. Herr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Erin N. Fischer
Represented By: M. Melissa Glassman
Represented By: Kathryn D. Sallie
Represented By: Courtney S. Schorr
Represented By: John D. Wilburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 101 Acres, and 41,342 Sq. Ft More or Less in Heidelberg Township, York County, Pennsylvania, Located on Tax ID# 30000EE01600000000, Owned By Bradley E. Herr and Elizabeth M. Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bradley E. Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth M. Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?