Snider v. Pennsylvania DOC et al
Plaintiff: Joel Snider
Defendant: Pennsylvania DOC, SCI Coal Township, SCI Graterford, Torrence State Hospital, Union County, SCI Camp Hill, SCI Greene, Kathleen Kane, Wetzel, Shaffer, Mooney, Wenerowicz, Harry, Gilmore, Romig, Longenderfer, McKeehan, Nichtman, Brenda Jeremiah, Karen Kaskie, Cherie Fallon, Pullmueller and Timon
Case Number: 4:2015cv00951
Filed: May 15, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Greene
Presiding Judge: Matthew W. Brann
Presiding Judge: Susan E. Schwab
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 394 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry)Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 1/13/2020. (mfa)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry).It is ORDERED the pro se Plaintiff's Motion [344} is DENIED. See order for further details.Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 12/2/19. (aaa)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER LIFTING STAY: SEE ORDER FOR ALL INFO; STAY LIFTED, MOTION AND ANSWER DEADLINES SET; Signed by Honorable Mark A Kearney on 9/30/19. (ep)
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Chief Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab's 198 Report and Recommendation is ADOPTED in its entirety; Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (ECF No. 181) is DISMISSED for failure to state a claim pursuant to 28 U.S .C. § 1915A; Plaintiff is GRANTED LEAVE to file a Second Amended Complaint that complies with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure within twenty-eight (28) days of this Order, and failure to comply with this directive may result in dismissal of this action; This case is REMANDED to Chief Magistrate Judge Schwab for further proceedings, including the disposition of Plaintiff's latest motion to appoint counsel (ECF No. 214) and to conduct a judicial screening of any Second Amended Complaint Mr. Snider may choose to file. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/12/2018. (jr)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION; denying 84 Motion ; denying 88 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 95 Motion for Extension of Time to File; denying 97 Motion to Extend Time; granting 99 Motion for Extension of Time to File; den ying 102 Motion to Extend Time; denying 107 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 111 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; denying 111 Motion for TRO; denying 115 Motion to Vacate ; denying 116 Motion to Extend Time; denying 122 Motion for TRO; denying 127 Motion to Extend Time; granting 128 Motion to Extend Time; granting 129 Motion to Extend Time; denying 130 Motion to Extend Time; denying 135 Motion to Extend Time; denying 136 Motion to E xtend Time; denying 138 Motion to Extend Time; denying 141 Motion; Plaintiff's objections to the December 18, 2015 orders are overruled; denying 144 Motion to Withdraw ; denying 147 Motion to Extend Time; granting 148 Motion to St rike ; granting 150 Motion for Leave to File; granting 154 Motion to Strike ; granting 160 Motion for Leave to File; Clerk directed to file the amended complaint; no further amendments will be granted; this case is remanded to MagJudge Schwa b to conduct judicial screening of this amended complaint; remaining defendants have 14 days from the issuance of a final order concerning MagJudge Schwab's screening decision to file a responsive dispositive motion. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/30/16. (see order for further/complete details)(lg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Snider v. Pennsylvania DOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Snider
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania DOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI Coal Township
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI Graterford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torrence State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI Camp Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCI Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wenerowicz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilmore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Romig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longenderfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKeehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichtman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Jeremiah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Kaskie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherie Fallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pullmueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?