Brugler v. UNUM Group et al
Plaintiff: |
Robert Brugler |
Defendant: |
UNUM Group and Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv01031 |
Filed: |
May 27, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Williamsport Office |
County: |
Centre |
Presiding Judge: |
Matthew W. Brann |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Contract |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 4, 2019 |
Filing
111
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motion for partial summary judgment, ECF No. 31, is DENIED with respect to Dr. Brugler's bad faith claim. Defendants' motion in limine, ECF No. 64, is DENIED. Defenda nts' motion in limine, ECF No. 65, is DENIED. Defendants' motion in limine, ECF No. 66, is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Defendants' motion in limine, ECF No. 67, is DENIED. Plaintiff's motion in limine, ECF No. 74, is DENIE D. Defendants are not precluded from bringing Dr. Brugler's credibility into question at trial. Defendants' motion for continuance made during the 10/3/2019 telephonic conference is DENIED. Defendants' 108 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/4/2019. (jr)
|
September 17, 2019 |
Filing
94
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' 64 Motion in Limine is GRANTED; Defendants' 65 Motion in Limine is GRANTED; Defendants' 66 Motion in Limine is GRANTED; Defendants' 67 Motion in Limine is GRANTED; and Plaintiff's 74 Motion in Limine is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/17/2019. (jr)
|
November 2, 2018 |
Filing
44
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Unum Group and Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, ECF No. 31, is GRANTED. Upon resolution of the remaining claims in this case, the Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants on Counts II, III, IV, and V of Plaintiffs Complaint, ECF No. 1. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/2/2018. (jr)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?