Fidler et al v. Geisinger Medical Center et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Fidler and Lisa Fidler
Defendant: Kimberly Pesarchick, Geisinger Medical Center, Geisinger Health Plan, Riedhammer, Marcus M., M.D., P.C. and Marcus M. Riedhammer
Not Classified By Court: Mediator
Case Number: 4:2015cv01602
Filed: August 16, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Montour
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2019 Filing 63 CERTIFIED ORDER of USCA in lieu of formal MANDATE as to #58 Notice of Appeal,, filed by Lisa Fidler, Matthew Fidler, granting motion to voluntarily dismiss appeal pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). (Renwrick, Aina)
January 17, 2018 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #61 TPO (Transcript Purchase Order Request) Filed. Documents and Docket Sheet available through ECF. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (lg)
January 16, 2018 Filing 61 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER REQUEST by Lisa Fidler, Matthew Fidler (Sachs, Robert)
December 21, 2017 Filing 60 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to Lyle Matthew Fidler by Lisa Fidler. (Sachs, Robert)
December 18, 2017 Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re #59 TPO (Transcript Purchase Order Request) Filed. Documents and Docket Sheet available through ECF. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (lg)
December 15, 2017 Filing 59 TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER REQUEST by Lisa Fidler, Matthew Fidler (Sachs, Robert)
October 30, 2017 TPO (TRANSCRIPT PURCHASE ORDER) SENT to Attorney Sachs re #58 Notice of Appeal. (lg)
October 30, 2017 Filing 58 NOTICE OF APPEAL in non-prisoner Case as to #57 Clerk's Judgment, #56 Order (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry), #55 Memorandum (Order to follow as separate docket entry), by Lisa Fidler, Matthew Fidler. Filing Fee and Docket Fee PAID. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0314-4240820. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (Sachs, Robert)
October 5, 2017 Filing 57 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Geisinger Medical Center, Marcus M. Riedhammer, M.D., P.C., Kimberly Pesarchick, and Marcus M. Riedhammer against Matthew Fidler and Lisa Fidler in accordance with this Court's Memorandum and Order dated 10/5/2017. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/5/2017. (jn)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #44 Defendants Geisinger Medical Center; Marcus M. Riedhammer, M.D., CWSP; Riedhammer, Marcus, M., MD, PC; and Kimberly Pesarchick, PA-Cs Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter final judgment in favor of Defendants and close this case. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/5/2017. (jn)
October 5, 2017 Filing 55 MEMORANDUM (Order to follow as separate docket entry) re #44 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Concise Statement of Facts filed by Kimberly Pesarchick, Marcus M. Riedhammer, Geisinger Medical Center, Riedhammer, Marcus M., M.D., P.C. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/5/2017. (jn)
July 18, 2017 Filing 54 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of proceedings, oral argument held on July 12, 2017, before Judge Matthew W. Brann. Court Reporter Lori Fausnaught, RMR/CRR, Telephone number 570.323.6704. Lori_Fausnaught@pamd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/8/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/18/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/16/2017. (cr6, )
April 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 SCHEDULING ORDER: Oral Argument on the pending Motion for Summary Judgment #51 is scheduled for 7/12/2017 at 10:00 AM in Williamsport - Courtroom 1 before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 4/24/2017. (jn)
March 9, 2017 Filing 51 Letter from Robert L. Sachs, Jr., Esquire requesting oral argument on Defts Motion for Summary Judgment. (Sachs, Robert)
March 7, 2017 Filing 50 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #44 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Concise Statement of Facts filed by Geisinger Medical Center, Kimberly Pesarchick, Marcus M. Riedhammer, Riedhammer, Marcus M., M.D., P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A)(Bryan, Anna)
February 21, 2017 Filing 49 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #44 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Concise Statement of Facts filed by Lisa Fidler, Matthew Fidler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Supplement, #3 Supplement, #4 Supplement, #5 Exhibit(s) A, #6 Exhibit(s) B, #7 Exhibit(s) C, #8 Exhibit(s) D, #9 Exhibit(s) E 1-180, #10 Exhibit(s) E 181-371, #11 Exhibit(s) E 372-604, #12 Exhibit(s) F, #13 Exhibit(s) F continued, #14 Exhibit(s) G, #15 Exhibit(s) H, #16 Exhibit(s) I, #17 Exhibit(s) J, #18 Exhibit(s) K, #19 Exhibit(s) L, #20 Exhibit(s) A continued)(Sachs, Robert)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiff may file a brief in support of their Opposition to the Motion for Summary Judgment which does not exceed twenty-five (25) pages in length and is consistent with all other Local Rules. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/17/2017. (jn)
February 16, 2017 Filing 47 First MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation by Lisa Fidler, Matthew Fidler.(Sachs, Robert)
January 31, 2017 Filing 46 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #44 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Concise Statement of Facts filed by Geisinger Medical Center, Kimberly Pesarchick, Marcus M. Riedhammer, Riedhammer, Marcus M., M.D., P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D, #5 Exhibit(s) E, #6 Exhibit(s) F, #7 Exhibit(s) G, #8 Exhibit(s) H, #9 Exhibit(s) I, #10 Exhibit(s) J, #11 Exhibit(s) K, #12 Exhibit(s) L, #13 Exhibit(s) M, #14 Exhibit(s) N, #15 Exhibit(s) O)(Bryan, Anna)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #43 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/18/17 (lg)
January 17, 2017 Filing 44 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Concise Statement of Facts by Geisinger Medical Center, Kimberly Pesarchick, Marcus M. Riedhammer, Riedhammer, Marcus M., M.D., P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E)(Bryan, Anna)
January 13, 2017 Filing 43 MOTION to Exceed Page Limitation FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Geisinger Health Plan, Geisinger Medical Center, Kimberly Pesarchick, Marcus M. Riedhammer, Riedhammer, Marcus M., M.D., P.C..(Bryan, Anna)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 42 SCHEDULING ORDER: GRANTING #41 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time; EXTENDING the Discovery ddl to 11/14/2016, and the Dispositive Motions ddl to 1/17/2017; all remaining case management ddls are held in abeyance pending the filing of dispositive motions, if any.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/5/16. (km)
October 5, 2016 Filing 41 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Lisa Fidler, Matthew Fidler.(Sachs, Robert)
October 4, 2016 DOCKET ANNOTATION:Counsel notified to file their letter requesting an extension of time (doc. #40) as a Motion for an Extension of Time with an proposed order and certificate of service. (ch1)
October 4, 2016 Filing 40 Letter from Robert L. Sachs, Jr., Esquire requesting thirty day extension of discovery deadline. (Sachs, Robert)
August 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Discovery Conference set for 8/26/2016 03:00 PM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for details.)Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/23/16. (km)
August 22, 2016 Filing 37 REQUEST for telephonic discovery conference by Lisa Fidler, Matthew Fidler. (Sachs, Robert)
August 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER: GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion for Attorney Withdrawal #33 ; Jeffrey V. Mansell's appearance on behalf of Plaintiffs is withdrawn and Mr. Mansell is excused from further responsibility in this matter. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/3/16. (km)
August 1, 2016 Filing 35 Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney regarding Jeffrey V. Mansell by Lisa Fidler, Matthew Fidler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mansell, Jeffrey)
July 28, 2016 DOCKET ANNOTATION: ECF registration form mailed to Attorney Conal Doyle. (lg)
July 28, 2016 Filing 34 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Conal Doyle. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/28/16. (lg)
July 28, 2016 DOCKET ANNOTATION: verified California bar status of Attorney Conal Doyle. (lg)
July 28, 2016 Filing 33 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice - Attorney Conal Doyle is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3826021. by All Plaintiffs.(Sachs, Robert)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER: GRANTING #30 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery; EXTENDING the discovery ddl to 10/5/2016; All other ddls in the CMC Order of 1/7/16 shall remain the same. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/11/16 (km)
July 11, 2016 Filing 31 Supplement by Geisinger Medical Center, Kimberly Pesarchick, Marcus M. Riedhammer, Riedhammer, Marcus M., M.D., P.C.. to #30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery . (Bryan, Anna)
July 11, 2016 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Anna Bryant was contacted by the Clerks Office and was requested to file a proposed order to the motion for ext of discovery using the civil event >>> other filings >>> other documents >>> supplement (lg)
July 11, 2016 Filing 30 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Geisinger Medical Center, Kimberly Pesarchick, Marcus M. Riedhammer, Riedhammer, Marcus M., M.D., P.C..(Bryan, Anna)
June 7, 2016 Filing 28 Letter from Defendants Geisinger Medical Center, Marcus M. Riedhammer, M.D., CWSP and Kimberly Pesarchick, PA-C in Response to Plaintiff's Request for a Discovery Conference. (Bryan, Anna)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Discovery Conference set for 6/13/2016 03:00 PM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for details.)Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/6/16. (km)
June 2, 2016 Filing 26 REQUEST for telephonic discovery conference by Lisa Fidler, Matthew Fidler. (Sachs, Robert)
May 24, 2016 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Sachs, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sachs, Robert)
April 29, 2016 Filing 24 REPORT OF MEDIATOR (Settlement Not Reached). (Reihart, Donald)
January 21, 2016 Filing 23 STIPULATION To Correct Caption by Lisa Fidler, Matthew Fidler. (Sachs, Robert)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation; APPOINTING Donald L. Reihart as the Mediator in this action.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/7/16. (km)
January 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - STANDARD CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK: Following an ICMC, the following dates/ddls apply to this case: Discovery due by 8/5/2016. Plaintiffs' Expert Report is due by 8/12/2016. Defendants' Expert Report is due by 9/30/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2016. Pretrial Memos due by 3/20/2017. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/27/2017 10:30 AM in Williamsport before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. Case placed on May 2017 trial term. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/7/2016. (cc: Jury Adm)(km)
December 30, 2015 Filing 19 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN JOINT CASE PLAN by Lisa Fidler, Matthew Fidler. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sachs, Robert)
December 29, 2015 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Sachs, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Certificate of service)(Sachs, Robert)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference set for 1/6/2016 10:00 AM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann.Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/10/15. (km)
December 7, 2015 Filing 16 ANSWER to #15 Amended Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Geisinger Medical Center, Kimberly Pesarchick, Marcus M. Riedhammer, Riedhammer, Marcus M., M.D., P.C..(Bryan, Anna)
November 16, 2015 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Geisinger Medical Center, Kimberly Pesarchick, Marcus M. Riedhammer, Riedhammer, Marcus M., M.D., P.C., filed by Matthew Fidler, Lisa Fidler.(Mansell, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE by Lisa Fidler, Matthew Fidler of filing Certificates of Merit (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Merit - Geisinger, #2 Certificate of Merit - Dr. Riedhammer, #3 Certificate of Merit - Riedhammer P.C., #4 Certificate of Merit - Kimberly Pesarchick)(Mansell, Jeffrey)
October 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: In view of Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #12 , Geisinger Health Plan is dismissed from the action without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/15/15. (km)
October 14, 2015 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lisa Fidler, Matthew Fidler as to Geisinger Health Plan only (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mansell, Jeffrey)
October 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: GRANTING #10 Motion to Extend Time for Filing of certificates of merit and responsive pleadings; certificates of merit due by 11/13/2015; defendants' responsive pleading to complaint due 20 days after the filing of the certificates of merit. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/14/15. (km)
October 14, 2015 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned (CORRECT waiver sent date 8/21/15); answer deadline for defendants UPDATED to 10/20/2015. (lg)
October 13, 2015 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to 30 days to file certificates of meritand to file responsive pleadings by Lisa Fidler, Matthew Fidler. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Order)(Mansell, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2015 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Matthew Fidler, Lisa Fidler. Geisinger Health Plan waiver sent on 9/24/2015, answer due 11/23/2015. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver of Summons)(Mansell, Jeffrey)
October 13, 2015 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Matthew Fidler, Lisa Fidler. Geisinger Medical Center waiver sent on 9/17/2015, answer due 11/16/2015; Kimberly Pesarchick waiver sent on 9/17/2015, answer due 11/16/2015; Marcus M. Riedhammer waiver sent on 9/17/2015, answer due 11/16/2015; Riedhammer, Marcus M., M.D., P.C. waiver sent on 9/17/2015, answer due 11/16/2015. (Attachments: #1 Executed Waiver of Summons)(Mansell, Jeffrey)
October 8, 2015 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J. Brier on behalf of Geisinger Health Plan (Brier, Frank)
September 15, 2015 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Riedhammer, Marcus M., M.D., P.C.. (Bryan, Anna)
September 15, 2015 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Geisinger Medical Center. (Bryan, Anna)
September 15, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Anna M. Bryan on behalf of Geisinger Medical Center, Kimberly Pesarchick, Marcus M. Riedhammer, Riedhammer, Marcus M., M.D., P.C.. (Bryan, Anna)
August 20, 2015 Filing 3 LETTER from Court to Counsel - Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/20/15. (km)
August 17, 2015 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Geisinger Health Plan, Geisinger Medical Center, Kimberly Pesarchick, Marcus M. Riedhammer, Riedhammer, Marcus M., M.D., P.C. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ch1)
August 16, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Geisinger Health Plan, Geisinger Medical Center, Kimberly Pesarchick, Marcus M. Riedhammer, Riedhammer, Marcus M., M.D., P.C. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 3516058), filed by Matthew Fidler, Lisa Fidler. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fidler et al v. Geisinger Medical Center et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Pesarchick
Represented By: Anna M. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Medical Center
Represented By: Anna M. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geisinger Health Plan
Represented By: Frank J. Brier
Represented By: Anna M. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riedhammer, Marcus M., M.D., P.C.
Represented By: Anna M. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marcus M. Riedhammer
Represented By: Anna M. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Fidler
Represented By: Conal F Doyle
Represented By: Robert L. Sachs, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey V. Mansell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Fidler
Represented By: Conal F Doyle
Represented By: Robert L. Sachs, Jr.
Represented By: Jeffrey V. Mansell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Mediator
Represented By: Donald L. Reihart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?