Rorke v. Aubrey Alexander Toyota et al
Plaintiff: Kim Rorke
Defendant: Aubrey Alexander Toyota and Michael Andretta
Case Number: 4:2016cv00219
Filed: February 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Snyder
Presiding Judge: Matthew W. Brann
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' 63 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/10/2019. (jr)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: 29 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a)(4)(A), Defendants shall file an answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, ECF No. 28, within 14 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 9/20/2017. (jn)
December 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry): dfts motion to dismiss is granted; pltf, if she so chooses, may file a second amended complaint by 1/12/17; if an amended complaint is not filed by this date, the action will be dismissed. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/22/16. (lg)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rorke v. Aubrey Alexander Toyota et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Rorke
Represented By: Wayne A. Ely
Represented By: W. Charles Sipio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aubrey Alexander Toyota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Andretta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?