Hunt v. Potter County et al
Plaintiff: Roy Hunt
Defendant: Potter County, Glenn C. Drake, II, Susan Kefover, Paul Heimel, Douglas Morley and Angela Milford
Case Number: 4:2016cv01729
Filed: August 18, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Office: Williamsport Office
County: Potter
Presiding Judge: Matthew W. Brann
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Plaintiff's 53 Motion in Limine is GRANTED IN PART, DENIED IN PART, and in part deferred to trial. Defendants' 55 Motion in Limine is DENIED. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/19/2020. (jr)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' 22 Motion for Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants Potter County, Glenn C. Drake, II, Susan Kefover, Paul Heimel, Douglas Morley, and Angela Milford, and to close this case. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/5/2018. (jr)
May 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry): IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss the Complaint 7 is DENIED. Defendants shall file an answer to the complaint on or before 6/7/2017. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/17/2017. (jn)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Potter County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Hunt
Represented By: Joshua J. Cochran
Represented By: Michael Zicolello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Potter County
Represented By: Robin A. Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn C. Drake, II
Represented By: Robin A. Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Kefover
Represented By: Robin A. Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Heimel
Represented By: Robin A. Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Morley
Represented By: Robin A. Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angela Milford
Represented By: Robin A. Read
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?