Vargas Torres v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: |
Hector Vargas Torres |
Defendant: |
B. Harris, Wendle, R. Cischko, K. Myers, B. A. Owns and McCallister |
Case Number: |
4:2017cv01977 |
Filed: |
October 30, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania |
Office: |
Williamsport Office |
County: |
Adams |
Presiding Judge: |
JV |
Presiding Judge: |
Matthew W. Brann |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
May 29, 2020 |
Filing
104
ORDER (memorandum filed previously as separate docket entry) - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 69 and 81 Plaintiff's motions for summary judgment are DENIED. 90 Defendants' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. Plaintiff's state law claim of negligent failure to intervene is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1367(c)(1). Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants and against Plaintiff on all claims remaining. Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this matter. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/29/2020. (lg)
|
February 13, 2019 |
Filing
57
ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 54 Magistrate Judge Carlson's Report and Recommendation is adopted in its entirety; all claims against Robert Sichko are dismissed; this case is remanded back to Magistrate Judge Carlson for further proceeedings; R. Cischko terminated. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/13/19. (lg)
|
January 18, 2019 |
Filing
55
MEMORANDUM ORDER - Torres motion to compel (Doc. 41 ), is DENIED, in part, and GRANTED, in part, as follows: The motion is DENIED in all respects except for one. Acting out of an abundance of caution, and in order to ensure transparency in discovery , on or before January 31, 2019 the dfts shall produce for in camera inspection by the court, the redacted and unredacted documents provided to Torres. As for Torres multiple motions to deny or defer his deposition, (Docs. 39 , 43 , and 44 ), these motions are DENIED, and the dfts should schedule this deposition at any mutually convenient place and time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on January 18, 2019. (kjn)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?