Beckhorn v. Guthrie Medical Group, P.C. et al
Plaintiff: Roberta Beckhorn
Defendant: M.D. Michael J. Georgetson, Guthrie Medical Group, P.C. and The Robert Packer Hospital
Case Number: 4:2018cv01670
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 10 Letter from Kevin P. Kuehner, Esq. . (Kuehner, Kevin)
October 11, 2018 Filing 9 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Kevin P. Kuehner. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/11/18. (lg)
October 11, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: verified NY bar record of Attorney Kevin Kuehner (lg)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Kevin P Kuehner on behalf of Roberta Beckhorn Attorney Kuehner, Kevin is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4568164.. (Kuehner, Kevin)
September 27, 2018 Filing 7 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #6 MOTION to Dismiss in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 filed by Michael J. Georgetson, Guthrie Medical Group, P.C., The Robert Packer Hospital.(Perry, Mark)
September 27, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Perry is instructed to file the memorandum/brief in support of motion to dismiss as a separate document using the civil event >>> motion and related filings >>> responses and replies >>> brief in support. Please do not refile the motion. (lg)
September 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12 by Michael J. Georgetson, Guthrie Medical Group, P.C., The Robert Packer Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Memo Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service, #3 Proposed Order)(Perry, Mark)
September 14, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary M. Montoro on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Affidavit of Service)(Montoro, Mary)
September 14, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Perry on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Perry, Mark)
August 24, 2018 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/24/2018. (jr)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lh)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-4522920), filed by Roberta Beckhorn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beckhorn v. Guthrie Medical Group, P.C. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D. Michael J. Georgetson
Represented By: Mary M. Montoro
Represented By: Mark T. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guthrie Medical Group, P.C.
Represented By: Mary M. Montoro
Represented By: Mark T. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Robert Packer Hospital
Represented By: Mary M. Montoro
Represented By: Mark T. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberta Beckhorn
Represented By: William S. Friedlander
Represented By: Kevin P Kuehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?