Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC v. Certain Easements and Rights of Way Necessary to Construct, Operate and Maintain a 30" Natural Gas Transmission Pipeline, in Northmoreland Township, Wyoming Cuonty, Pennsylvania, Tax Parcel Numbe et al

Plaintiff: Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Defendant: Mary Ann Wilson, Larry Wilson, All Unknown Owners, Certain Easements and Rights of Way Necessary to Construct, Operate and Maintain a 30" Natural Gas Transmission Pipeline, in Northmoreland Township, Wyoming Cuonty, Pennsylvania, Tax Parcel Numbe and Certain Easements and Rights of Way Necessary to Construct, Operate and Maintain a 30" Natural Gas Transmission Pipeline, in Northmoreland Township, Wyoming County, Pennsylvania, Tax Parcel Numbe
Case Number: 4:2018cv02096
Filed: October 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 24, 2018 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Larry Wilson, Mary Ann Wilson re #23 Brief in Opposition, (Huffsmith, Richard)
December 24, 2018 Filing 23 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #13 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession of Rights of Way filed by Larry Wilson, Mary Ann Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Answer to Motion, #2 Proposed Order)(Huffsmith, Richard)
December 24, 2018 Filing 22 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #13 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession of Rights of Way filed by Larry Wilson, Mary Ann Wilson.(Huffsmith, Richard)
December 21, 2018 Filing 21 REPLY BRIEF re #10 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix, #2 Certificate of Service)(Witmer, Elizabeth)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is scheduled for 1/4/2019 at 11:00 AM in Williamsport - Courtroom 1 before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. Plaintiff's #14 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Excess of 5,000 Words is GRANTED. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/12/2018. (jr)
December 12, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Doc. 20 deleted per request of counsel. (dmn)
December 12, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Larry Wilson, Mary Ann Wilson re #16 Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment, #17 Answer to Statement of Facts, #18 Brief in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment (Huffsmith, Richard)
December 12, 2018 Filing 18 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #10 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Larry Wilson, Mary Ann Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Huffsmith, Richard)
December 12, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER TO STATEMENT OF FACTS filed by Larry Wilson, Mary Ann Wilson.(Huffsmith, Richard)
December 12, 2018 Filing 16 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #10 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Larry Wilson, Mary Ann Wilson.(Huffsmith, Richard)
December 10, 2018 Filing 15 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #13 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession of Rights of Way filed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Unpublished Decisions, #2 Certificate of Service)(Witmer, Elizabeth)
December 10, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to File Brief in Excess of 5,000 Words by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #3 Certificate of Service)(Witmer, Elizabeth)
December 10, 2018 Filing 13 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction for Immediate Possession of Rights of Way by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of D. Sztroin, #3 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #4 Certificate of Service)(Witmer, Elizabeth)
November 21, 2018 Filing 12 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #10 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Appendix of Unpublished Decisions, #2 Certificate of Service)(Witmer, Elizabeth)
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 STATEMENT OF FACTS re #10 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Witmer, Elizabeth)
November 21, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of David Sztroin, #3 Declaration of Aaron Blair, #4 Certificate of Nonconcurrence, #5 Certificate of Service)(Witmer, Elizabeth)
November 21, 2018 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Larry Wilson, Mary Ann Wilson.(Huffsmith, Richard)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Letter from Court dated 10/29/2018 served on Mary Ann Wilson on 10/31/2018, filed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. (Witmer, Elizabeth)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Letter from Court dated 10/29/2018 served on Larry Wilson on 10/31/2018, filed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. (Witmer, Elizabeth)
November 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. Mary Ann Wilson served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Witmer, Elizabeth)
November 12, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. Larry Wilson served on 10/31/2018, answer due 11/21/2018. (Witmer, Elizabeth)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 10/29/2018. (jr) (Main Document 4 replaced on 11/5/2018) (jr).
October 29, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg)
October 26, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC (lg)
October 26, 2018 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT IN CONDEMNATION OF PROPERTY PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P. 71.1 against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4584176), filed by Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC v. Certain Easements and Rights of Way Necessary to Construct, Operate and Maintain a 30" Natural Gas Transmission Pipeline, in Northmoreland Township, Wyoming Cuonty, Pennsylvania, Tax Parcel Numbe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Transcontinental Gas Pipe Line Company, LLC
Represented By: Sean T. O'Neill
Represented By: Elizabeth U. Witmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Ann Wilson
Represented By: Richard L Huffsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Wilson
Represented By: Richard L Huffsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Unknown Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Easements and Rights of Way Necessary to Construct, Operate and Maintain a 30" Natural Gas Transmission Pipeline, in Northmoreland Township, Wyoming Cuonty, Pennsylvania, Tax Parcel Numbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Certain Easements and Rights of Way Necessary to Construct, Operate and Maintain a 30" Natural Gas Transmission Pipeline, in Northmoreland Township, Wyoming County, Pennsylvania, Tax Parcel Numbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?