Conklin v. Hawbaker Engineering et al

Plaintiff: Leslie Conklin
Defendant: Glenn O. Hawbaker and Hawbaker Engineering
Case Number: 4:2018cv02128
Filed: November 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 Amended ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Glenn O. Hawbaker, Hawbaker Engineering. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Exhibit(s), #3 Exhibit(s), #4 Exhibit(s))(Henry, Schaun)
December 7, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Glenn O. Hawbaker, Hawbaker Engineering.(Henry, Schaun)
December 4, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Langdon T Ramsburg on behalf of Glenn O. Hawbaker, Hawbaker Engineering (Ramsburg, Langdon)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Schaun D. Henry on behalf of Glenn O. Hawbaker, Hawbaker Engineering (Henry, Schaun)
December 3, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Glenn O. Hawbaker, Hawbaker Engineering. (Ramsburg, Langdon)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/7/2018. (jr)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg)
November 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4591329), filed by Leslie Conklin. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Conklin v. Hawbaker Engineering et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glenn O. Hawbaker
Represented By: Schaun D. Henry
Represented By: Langdon T Ramsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawbaker Engineering
Represented By: Schaun D. Henry
Represented By: Langdon T Ramsburg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Conklin
Represented By: Thomas B. Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?