Potts v. PPL Corporation

Plaintiff: Warren Potts
Defendant: PPL Corporation
Case Number: 4:2018cv02181
Filed: November 11, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kayleen Egan on behalf of PPL Corporation (Egan, Kayleen)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by PPL Corporation. (Kirshenbaum, Andrea)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea M. Kirshenbaum on behalf of PPL Corporation (Kirshenbaum, Andrea)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/14/18. (lg)
November 13, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Lovecchio is instructed to update his ECF account information to reflect current law firm name, address and phone number and also to update his ECF account email information (email still showing for the Campana law firm as well as new firm); this case be done in ECF, Utilities, Maintain My Account. (lg)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to PPL Corporation and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg)
November 11, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PPL Corporation ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4596882), filed by Warren Potts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potts v. PPL Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Potts
Represented By: Christian A. Lovecchio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PPL Corporation
Represented By: Andrea M. Kirshenbaum
Represented By: Kayleen Egan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?