Ohl et al v. Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Ohl and Lori Anderson
Defendant: Russell Baker, David Brookover, Stephen Bowes, Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., Melanie Henry, Jane Does 1-10, United Food & Commercial Workers International Union, Does Entities 1-10, United Food & Commercial Workers International Union, Local 38 and John Does #1-10
Case Number: 4:2018cv02228
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #10 Stipulation of Dismissal is approved, and that claims against Defendant, UNITED FOOD & COMMERCIAL WORKERS INTERNATIONAL UNION, are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs. United Food & Commercial Workers International Union terminated. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/20/2018. (jr)
December 14, 2018 Filing 11 Proposed Pretrial Order by Lori Anderson, Lisa Ohl. (Cummings, Derrek)
December 14, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Cummings is instructed to file a separate, proposed order for Judge Brann's signature/approval re stipulation to dismiss certain parties using the civil event "proposed pretrial order" or "supplement". (lg)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, by Lori Anderson, Lisa Ohl. (Cummings, Derrek)
December 11, 2018 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Lori Anderson, Lisa Ohl. Russell Baker waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019; Stephen Bowes waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019; United Food & Commercial Workers International Union waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019; United Food & Commercial Workers International Union, Local 38 waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Cummings, Derrek)
December 7, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: ECF registration form sent to Attorney Jeffrey Keiper (lg)
December 7, 2018 Filing 8 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Jeffrey Keiper. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/7/18. (lg)
December 6, 2018 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Verified OH bar record of Attorney Jeffrey Keiper. (lg)
December 6, 2018 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Marjorie Nancy Kaye on behalf of Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., David Brookover, Melanie Henry Attorney Jeffrey B. Keiper is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4617054., filed by on behalf of Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., David Brookover, Melanie Henry.(Kaye, Marjorie)
November 30, 2018 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Lori Anderson. Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc. waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019; David Brookover waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019; Does Entities 1-10 waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019; Melanie Henry waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019; Jane Does 1-10 waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019; John Does #1-10 waiver sent on 11/20/2018, answer due 1/22/2019. (Gunther, Stephen)
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/28/2018. (jr)
November 27, 2018 Filing 4 EXHIBIT Exhibit A by Lori Anderson re #1 Complaint,. (Gunther, Stephen)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Russell Baker, Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., Stephen Bowes, David Brookover, Does Entities 1-10, Melanie Henry, Jane Does 1-10, John Does #1-10, United Food & Commercial Workers International Union, United Food & Commercial Workers International Union, Local 38 and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (ch1)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Russell Baker, Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc., Stephen Bowes, David Brookover, Does Entities 1-10, Melanie Henry, Jane Does 1-10, John Does #1-10, United Food & Commercial Workers International Union, United Food & Commercial Workers International Union, Local 38 ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4603190), filed by Lori Anderson, Lisa Ohl. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ch1)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ohl et al v. Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Russell Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Brookover
Represented By: Jeffrey B Keiper
Represented By: Marjorie Nancy Kaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Bowes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big Heart Pet Brands, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey B Keiper
Represented By: Marjorie Nancy Kaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melanie Henry
Represented By: Jeffrey B Keiper
Represented By: Marjorie Nancy Kaye
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Food & Commercial Workers International Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Food & Commercial Workers International Union, Local 38
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does #1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Ohl
Represented By: Derrek William Cummings
Represented By: Steve T. Mahan
Represented By: Stephen P. Gunther
Represented By: Larry A. Weisberg
Represented By: Steve Todd Mahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Anderson
Represented By: Derrek William Cummings
Represented By: Steve T. Mahan
Represented By: Stephen P. Gunther
Represented By: Larry A. Weisberg
Represented By: Steve Todd Mahan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?