Bonilla v. Bathgate et al

Plaintiff: Frankie Bonilla
Defendant: Keifer Bathgate and Michael Vognetz
Case Number: 4:2018cv02343
Filed: December 7, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Referring Judge: Karoline Mehalchick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2018 Filing 8 AO 398 and AO 399 Service Forms Completed by Plaintiff for Keifer Bathgate only. (nr)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 U.S. MARSHAL 285 FORM(s) received by plaintiff. (nr)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION by Frankie Bonilla allowing prison to submit copy of prisoner's trust fund account to the court, and approving the entire filing fee to be deducted from prisoner inmate account. (nr)
December 17, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Frankie Bonilla. (Attachments: #1 Inmate Statement)(nr)
December 12, 2018 Filing 4 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 18-2343. (Attachments: #1 IFP (Civil Rights), #2 Authorization Form)(lp)
December 7, 2018 Filing 3 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (nr)
December 7, 2018 Filing 2 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: #1 Order)(nr)
December 7, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Frankie Bonilla, pro se.(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonilla v. Bathgate et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keifer Bathgate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Vognetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?