KeyBank National Association v. Videomining Corporation

Plaintiff: KeyBank National Association
Defendant: Videomining Corporation
Case Number: 4:2018cv02377
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by KeyBank National Association. Videomining Corporation served on 12/28/2018, answer due 2/18/2019. (Haney, James)
January 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Dafney Dubisson Stokes on behalf of KeyBank National Association (Stokes, Dafney)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Videomining Corporation answer due 2/18/2019. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 1/16/2019. (jr)
January 15, 2019 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Videomining Corporation. (Bower, Jeffrey)
January 15, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Videomining Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bower, Jeffrey)
December 20, 2018 Filing 4 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/20/2018. (jr)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by KeyBank National Association identifying Corporate Parent KeyCorp for KeyBank National Association.. (Haney, James)
December 14, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Videomining Corporation and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Videomining Corporation ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4624734), filed by KeyBank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KeyBank National Association v. Videomining Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KeyBank National Association
Represented By: James Kevin Haney
Represented By: Dafney Dubisson Stokes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Videomining Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?