Wenger v. Seterus, Inc.

Plaintiff: Kay Wenger
Defendant: Seterus, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2018cv02393
Filed: December 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiffs' attorneys are instructed to update the firm name by logging into ECF and use the "Utilities" tab >>> "Your Account" to update the information (lg)
January 30, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Kay Wenger -- NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME (Johns, Benjamin)
January 14, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Kay Wenger. Seterus, Inc. waiver sent on 1/14/2019, answer due 3/15/2019. (Johns, Benjamin)
December 20, 2018 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 12/20/2018. (jr)
December 19, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Seterus, Inc. and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr)
December 18, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Seterus, Inc. ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4627953), filed by Kay Wenger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wenger v. Seterus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seterus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kay Wenger
Represented By: Asa C. Edwards
Represented By: Scott C Harris
Represented By: Benjamin F. Johns
Represented By: Edward H. Maginnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?