DERR et al v. NORTHUMBERLAND COUNTY CHILDREN AND YOUTH SERVICES et al
Plaintiff: Grace M. Derr, William J. Derr and Stephen A. Derr
Defendant: NOURTHUMBERLAND COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, Cathy Gemberling, KIMBERLY BEST, Jill Snyder, Richard J. Schoch, SHAWN HOMAN, Northumberland County Children and Youth Services, LISA SCHAFFERR, Marie Milke, SAMUEL J. SHICACATANO, Amanda Williard, Kimberly Bills Carpenter, KATRINA GOWNLEY, "SELISSA" MAUGER, MONIKA HOMAN, FAMILIES UNITED NETWORK and KATHY HOLLABAOUGH
Case Number: 4:2019cv00215
Filed: February 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: William I Arbuckle
Referring Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 24 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by FAMILIES UNITED NETWORK.(McCarroll, Scott)
April 5, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by FAMILIES UNITED NETWORK. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McCarroll, Scott)
April 5, 2019 Filing 22 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by KIMBERLY BEST, Kimberly Bills Carpenter, KATRINA GOWNLEY, Cathy Gemberling, KATHY HOLLABAOUGH, MONIKA HOMAN, SHAWN HOMAN, "SELISSA" MAUGER, Marie Milke, NOURTHUMBERLAND COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, Northumberland County Children and Youth Services, LISA SCHAFFERR, SAMUEL J. SHICACATANO, Richard J. Schoch, Jill Snyder, Amanda Williard.(Munion, Christine)
April 5, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by KIMBERLY BEST, Kimberly Bills Carpenter, KATRINA GOWNLEY, Cathy Gemberling, KATHY HOLLABAOUGH, MONIKA HOMAN, SHAWN HOMAN, "SELISSA" MAUGER, Marie Milke, NOURTHUMBERLAND COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, Northumberland County Children and Youth Services, LISA SCHAFFERR, SAMUEL J. SHICACATANO, Richard J. Schoch, Jill Snyder, Amanda Williard. (Attachments: #1 Notice Under Local Rule 7.1, #2 Exhibit(s) A, #3 Exhibit(s) B, #4 Exhibit(s) C, #5 Exhibit(s) D, #6 Exhibit(s) E, #7 Exhibit(s) F, #8 Exhibit(s) G, #9 Proposed Order)(Munion, Christine)
April 5, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: doc 21 & 22 have been deleted and will be re-filed by counsel (cl)
April 4, 2019 Filing 20 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by FAMILIES UNITED NETWORK. (McCarroll, Scott)
April 2, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Article 3 Judge assignment by Grace M. Derr, Stephen A. Derr, William J. Derr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(nr)
April 2, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Change Venue by Grace M. Derr, Stephen A. Derr, William J. Derr. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(nr)
March 14, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by FAMILIES UNITED NETWORK. FAMILIES UNITED NETWORK waiver sent on 2/13/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (McCarroll, Scott)
March 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. McCarroll on behalf of FAMILIES UNITED NETWORK (McCarroll, Scott)
March 5, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Cathy Gemberling, Richard J. Schoch, Jill Snyder, SHAWN HOMAN, LISA SCHAFFERR, KATHY HOLLABAOUGH, KIMBERLY BEST, "SELISSA" MAUGER, Kimberly Bills Carpenter, Marie Milke, Amanda Williard, SAMUEL J. SHICACATANO, Northumberland County Children and Youth Services, MONIKA HOMAN, KATRINA GOWNLEY, NOURTHUMBERLAND COUNTY COMMISSIONERS. Cathy Gemberling waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; Richard J. Schoch waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; Jill Snyder waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; SHAWN HOMAN waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; LISA SCHAFFERR waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; KATHY HOLLABAOUGH waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; KIMBERLY BEST waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; "SELISSA" MAUGER waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; Kimberly Bills Carpenter waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; Marie Milke waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; Amanda Williard waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; SAMUEL J. SHICACATANO waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; Northumberland County Children and Youth Services waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; MONIKA HOMAN waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; KATRINA GOWNLEY waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019; NOURTHUMBERLAND COUNTY COMMISSIONERS waiver sent on 3/5/2019, answer due 5/6/2019. (Munion, Christine)
March 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine E. Munion on behalf of KIMBERLY BEST, Kimberly Bills Carpenter, KATRINA GOWNLEY, Cathy Gemberling, KATHY HOLLABAOUGH, MONIKA HOMAN, SHAWN HOMAN, "SELISSA" MAUGER, Marie Milke, NOURTHUMBERLAND COUNTY COMMISSIONERS (Munion, Christine)
February 21, 2019 Filing 13 Waiver of Service Returned Unexecuted (RTS, No longer employed here) as to Cathy Gemberling, Jill Snyder, Amanda Williard. (nr)
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Service forms (AO 398 and 399), 2/13/2019 Order, Complaint and Waiver envelope mailed to KIMBERLY BEST, Kimberly Bills Carpenter, FAMILIES UNITED NETWORK, KATRINA GOWNLEY, Cathy Gemberling, KATHY HOLLABAOUGH, MONIKA HOMAN, SHAWN HOMAN, "SELISSA" MAUGER, Marie Milke, NOURTHUMBERLAND COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, Northumberland County Children and Youth Services, LISA SCHAFFERR, SAMUEL J. SHICACATANO, Richard J. Schoch, Jill Snyder, Amanda Williard Waiver of Service due by 3/15/2019. (nr)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DIRECTING THE CLERK'S OFFICE TO serve a copy of the complaint, notice of lawsuit and request for waiver of service of summons, waiver, and this order on the defendants named in plaintiffs complaint Granting #7 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The complaint is now deemed filed. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 2/13/19. (ch1)
February 7, 2019 Filing 10 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (lg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION/application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Grace M. Derr. (originally filed 1/28/19 in Eastern District of PA)(lg)
February 7, 2019 Filing 8 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER SENT TO PLAINTIFFS AND PRO SE LETTER. (Attachments: #1 285 FORMS)(lh)
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Stephen A. Derr. (original IFP filed in USED on 1/28/19)(lh)
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in electronically from District of Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 5:19-cv-00417 containing 1-5 electronic documents and docket sheet received. (lh)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FORTHWITH TRANSFER THIS CASE TO THE CLERK OF THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT FOR THE MIDDLE DISTRICT OF PENNSYLVANIA. PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS SHALL BE LEFT TO THE DISCRETION OF THE TRANSFEREE COURT. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL CLOSE THIS CASE IN THIS DISTRICT; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE MARK A. KEARNEY ON 1/31/19. 1/31/19 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE.(jl, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/7/2019.]
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES (mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/7/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT (lodged with motion for ifp) pending against KIMBERLY BEST, KIMBERLY BILLS CARPENTER, FAMILIES UNITED NETWORK, CATHY GEMBERLING, KATRINA GOWNLEY, KATHY HOLLABAOUGH, MONIKA HOMAN, SHAWN HOMAN, "SELISSA" MAUGER, MARIE MILKE, NORTHUMBERLAND COUNTY CHILDREN AND YOUTH SERVICES, NOURTHUMBERLAND COUNTY COMMISSIONERS, LISA SCHAFFERR, RICHARD J. SCHOCH, SAMUEL J. SHICACATANO, JILL SNYDER, AMANDA WILLIARD, filed by WILLIAM J. DERR, GRACE M. DERR, STEPHEN A. DERR. IFP FILED. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mas, ) Modified on 1/30/2019 (mas, ). [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/7/2019.] Modified on 2/7/2019 - to include "lodged" lanaguage (lg).
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS FILED BY STEPHEN A. DERR. AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF THE APPLICATION. (mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/7/2019.]
January 28, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS FILED BY GRACE M. DERR, WILLIAM J. DERR. AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF THE APPLICATION. (mas, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 2/7/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DERR et al v. NORTHUMBERLAND COUNTY CHILDREN AND YOUTH SERVICES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace M. Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen A. Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NOURTHUMBERLAND COUNTY COMMISSIONERS
Represented By: Christine E. Munion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathy Gemberling
Represented By: Christine E. Munion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIMBERLY BEST
Represented By: Christine E. Munion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jill Snyder
Represented By: Christine E. Munion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard J. Schoch
Represented By: Christine E. Munion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SHAWN HOMAN
Represented By: Christine E. Munion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northumberland County Children and Youth Services
Represented By: Christine E. Munion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LISA SCHAFFERR
Represented By: Christine E. Munion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Milke
Represented By: Christine E. Munion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAMUEL J. SHICACATANO
Represented By: Christine E. Munion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Williard
Represented By: Christine E. Munion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Bills Carpenter
Represented By: Christine E. Munion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATRINA GOWNLEY
Represented By: Christine E. Munion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: "SELISSA" MAUGER
Represented By: Christine E. Munion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MONIKA HOMAN
Represented By: Christine E. Munion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FAMILIES UNITED NETWORK
Represented By: Scott D. McCarroll
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KATHY HOLLABAOUGH
Represented By: Christine E. Munion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?