Kneale v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Jade Cortni Kneale
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Case Number: 4:2019cv00365
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Referring Judge: Joseph F Saporito
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2019 Filing 9 USM285 form of Service for Summons and Complaint served on U.S. Atty, Scranton on 4/3/19. (ep)
March 19, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Plaintiff's counsel is reminded that when the Court orders service of the complaint by the United States Marshal, there is no need for Plaintiff's counsel to serve the defendants; service will be done by the USM and proof thereof will be provided to the Clerk for docketing. (lg)
March 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jade Cortni Kneale to US Attorney General Harrisburg, PA (Rosamilia, Charles)
March 18, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jade Cortni Kneale to US Attorney General, Washington DC (Rosamilia, Charles)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jade Cortni Kneale to Nancy Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Rosamilia, Charles)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Nancy Berryhill and provided TO U.S. MARSHAL for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 Service Form) (ep)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING U.S. MARSHAL TO SERVE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT ; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. COMPLAINT IS NOW DEEMED FILED.Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph F. Saporito, Jr on 3/11/19. (ms)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER 13-9 in Social Security Appeals.(lg)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION/application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jade Cortni Kneale.(lg)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy Berryhill lodged pending the disposition of the Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, filed by Jade Cortni Kneale. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kneale v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jade Cortni Kneale
Represented By: Charles R. Rosamilia, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?