Elbow Energy, LLC v. Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.
Plaintiff: Elbow Energy, LLC
Defendant: Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.
Case Number: 4:2019cv00764
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 11 REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc..(Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 BRIEF IN OPPOSITION re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Elbow Energy, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Law, #3 Certificate of Service)(Crawford, Joseph)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc..(Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Equinor USA Properties Inc., Other Affiliate Equinor US Holdings Inc., Other Affiliate Equinor Energy AS, Other Affiliate Equinor ASA for Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.. (Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thomas J Galligan on behalf of Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc. Attorney Thomas J. Galligan is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4768984.. (Galligan, Thomas)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/10/2019. (jr)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc. answer due 5/24/2019. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 5/10/2019. (jr)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 Supplement by Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.. to #2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
May 9, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Bagnell is instructed to file a proposed order using the event supplement. (jr)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc..(Snyder Bagnell, Nicolle)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc. from Lycoming County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19-05353. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4750261), filed by Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elbow Energy, LLC v. Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elbow Energy, LLC
Represented By: Joseph C. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equinor USA Onshore Properties Inc.
Represented By: Thomas J Galligan
Represented By: Nicolle R. Snyder Bagnell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?