Poole v. Schmidt et al
Plaintiff: Arthur L. Poole
Defendant: Kelly Pelcher, Robert J. Schmidt, Brian Clark, Jane Doe, -, John Doe and Dustin Sweitzer
Case Number: 4:2019cv00904
Filed: May 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: CK
Referring Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #1 Poole's Complaint is dismissed without prejudice; #8 Poole's improper ifp application is denied; Clerk directed to close this case. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/10/19. (case closed) (lg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 TWENTY (20) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the plaintiff to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 20 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 06/10/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP (general))(lp) Modified on 6/10/2019 (lp).
June 7, 2019 Filing 9 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Arthur L. Poole. (bg)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Arthur L. Poole.(bg)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the plaintiff to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 05/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP form)(lp)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 PRO SE LETTER ISSUED w/ Notice & Consent Form. (lg)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING PRACTICE ORDER (Attachments: #1 order, #2 285 Service Packet with IFP Notice)(lg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Arthur L. Poole (address updated to Chestnut Street, Harrisburg. (lg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for subpoena by Arthur L. Poole. (lg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 2 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION by Arthur L. Poole allowing prison to submit copy of prisoner's trust fund account to the court, and approving the entire filing fee to be deducted from prisoner inmate account. (lg)
May 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Arthur L. Poole, pro se.(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poole v. Schmidt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arthur L. Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Pelcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Schmidt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Sweitzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?