Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp. v. Northwoods Auto et al
Plaintiff: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp.
Defendant: Timothy Slike, Northwoods Auto and Northwoods Auto Inc. d/b/a Northwoods Nissan
Case Number: 4:2019cv00944
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER DISMISSING CASE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that all claims against Northwoods are hereby DISMISSED without prejudice; and the Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE this case. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 3/10/2020. (jr)
March 5, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE by Timothy Slike (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Notice of Bankruptcy Filing, #2 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Service)(Chernicoff, Robert)
March 4, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp. without prejudice as to Defendant, Northwoods Auto, Inc. d/b/a Northwoods Nissan, only (Lipman, Matthew)
March 4, 2020 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerks Office staff contacted Attorney Chernicoff and requested he e-file the Notice of Stay that was mailed to, and received by the Clerk's Office in Williamsport this date. (lg)
February 19, 2020 Filing 25 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp. against Timothy Slike. (lg)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #21 Motion for Default Judgment is granted; Judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Slike in the amount of $326,422.43; in light of the ongoing bankruptcy proceeding, within 10 days Plaintiff shall advise the Court of the status of any claims against Northwood. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 2/19/2020 (lg)
February 13, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp. re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction of Voluntary Withdrawal of Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunctive Relief (Lipman, Matthew)
January 20, 2020 Filing 22 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Counts against Timothy Slike filed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp..(Lipman, Matthew)
January 6, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Default Judgment as to All Counts against Timothy Slike by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Judgment by Default, #2 Affidavit Affidavit in Support)(Lipman, Matthew)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Slike may, within 14 days of the date of this Order, respond to Plaintiff's #18 Request for Entry of Default and address whether the automatic stay applies to Slike in his personal capacity; and Should Slike file such a brief, Plaintiff may file a reply brief within 14days of such filing. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 11/27/2019. (jr)
November 15, 2019 Filing 19 RETURN OF SERVICE (Non Summons & Complaint) by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp. (Lipman, Matthew)
November 15, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Lipman is requested to file proof of service of summons and complaint upon dft Slike as indicated in the declaration accompanying the request for entry of default. (lg)
November 14, 2019 Filing 18 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Matthew A. Lipman)(Lipman, Matthew)
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Northwoods Auto (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chernicoff, Robert)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #13 Stipulation filed by the parties is APPROVED and shall remain in effect until further Order of the Court. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/12/2019. (jr)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 Supplement by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp.. to Docket Annotation, #13 Stipulation . (Lipman, Matthew)
June 11, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: Attorney Lipman is instructed to file a separate proposed order for Judge Brann's approval/signature re stipulation, using the civil event "proposed pretrial order" or "supplement"; please do not refile the stipulation. (lg)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp.. (Lipman, Matthew)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 6/10/2019 at 4:00 PM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/10/2019. (jr)
June 6, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Plaintiff's Counsel to the Court re Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order and/or Preliminary Injunction . (Lipman, Matthew)
June 5, 2019 Filing 10 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Salvatore Giampiccolo. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/5/19. (lg)
June 5, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: verified NJ bar record of Attorney Salvatore Giampiccolo. (lg)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Chernicoff on behalf of Northwoods Auto, Timothy Slike (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Chernicoff, Robert)
June 4, 2019 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Salvatore A Giampiccolo on behalf of Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp. Attorney Giampiccolo is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4777388.. (Giampiccolo, Salvatore)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference scheduled for 6/4/2019 at 4:00 PM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/3/2019. (jr)
June 3, 2019 Filing 5 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 6/3/2019. (jr)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 BRIEF IN SUPPORT re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit Exhibit A, #3 Affidavit Exhibit B, #4 Affidavit Exhibit C, #5 Affidavit Exhibit D, #6 Affidavit Exhibit E, #7 Affidavit Exhibit F, #8 Affidavit Exhibit G, #9 Affidavit Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit 1)(lg)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Proposed Order)(lg)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4775507), filed by Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp. v. Northwoods Auto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Slike
Represented By: Robert E. Chernicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwoods Auto
Represented By: Robert E. Chernicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northwoods Auto Inc. d/b/a Northwoods Nissan
Represented By: Robert E. Chernicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nissan Motor Acceptance Corp.
Represented By: Matthew A. Lipman
Represented By: Salvatore A Giampiccolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?