HLS Partnership et al v. SWEPI LP
Plaintiff: Carol Paradowski and HLS Partnership
Counter Plaintiff: SWEPI LP
Case Number: 4:2019cv01204
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER - STANDARD CASE MANAGEMENT TRACK: Following an Initial Case Management conference, the following dates apply to this case: Discovery due by 5/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/3/2020.Plaintiff Expert Report is due by 11/2/2020. Defendant Expert Report is due by 12/2/2020. Expert Discovery Deadline is due by 12/16/2020. Pretrial Memos due by 1/13/2021. Final Pretrial Conference scheduled for 1/26/2021 in Chambers before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. Case placed on the March 2021 trial term. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/22/2019. (jr)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN - Joint [Proposed] by HLS Partnership, Carol Paradowski. (Burnett, Robert)
August 12, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION/NOTE TO PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL: Attorney Bergenthal is required to register as an ECF User; all participating attorneys are required to be ECF Users unless they petition the Chief Judge for exemption. The ECF registration form can be found on our Court's website. (lg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Justin Werner. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/12/19. (lg)
August 12, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: verified PA bar record of Attorney Justin Werner. (lg)
August 12, 2019 Filing 7 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Justin H Werner on behalf of SWEPI LP Attorney Justin Werner is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4840210., filed by on behalf of SWEPI LP.(Werner, Justin)
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Answer to Petition for Removal, Counterclaim by HLS Partnership, Carol Paradowski. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1, #2 Exhibit(s) 2)(Burnett, Robert)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephonic Initial Case Management Conference scheduled for 8/22/2019 at 2:30 PM before Honorable Matthew W. Brann. (See Order for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/30/2019. (jr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SWEPI LP identifying Corporate Parent Shell Energy Holding GP LLC, Corporate Parent Shell US E&P Investments LLC, Other Affiliate Royal Dutch Shell PLC for SWEPI LP.. (Burt, Stefanie)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 SWEPI LP's ANSWER to Petition for Removal with declaratory judgments , COUNTERCLAIM of SWEPI LP against HLS Partnership, Carol Paradowski by SWEPI LP.(Burt, Stefanie)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/15/2019. (jr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SWEPI LP from Tioga County Court of Common Pleas, case number 434-CV-2019. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 4814655), filed by SWEPI LP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1 of 3), #2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2 of 3), #3 Exhibit 1 (Part 3 of 3), #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HLS Partnership et al v. SWEPI LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Paradowski
Represented By: Robert J. Burnett
Represented By: Brendan A O'Donnell
Represented By: Erik M. Bergenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HLS Partnership
Represented By: Robert J. Burnett
Represented By: Brendan A O'Donnell
Represented By: Erik M. Bergenthal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter plaintiff: SWEPI LP
Represented By: Stefanie Lepore Burt
Represented By: Justin H Werner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?