Henry v. Caggiano et al
Plaintiff: Charles A. Henry, Jr.
Defendant: Anthony V. Caggiano, Sr., Med-Link Staffing, Cardiac & Vascular Surgery Associates, Robert Packer Hospital, Guthrie Clinic LTD and Felice L. Reitknecht
Case Number: 4:2019cv01205
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Middle District of Pennsylvania
Presiding Judge: Matthew W Brann
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Robert Packer Hospital, Felice L. Reitknecht, Guthrie Clinic LTD. Robert Packer Hospital waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Felice L. Reitknecht waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019; Guthrie Clinic LTD waiver sent on 7/18/2019, answer due 9/16/2019. (Perry, Mark)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION by Guthrie Clinic LTD, Felice L. Reitknecht, Robert Packer Hospital. (Montoro, Mary)
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Med-Link Staffing. (Jayman, Aaron)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary M. Montoro on behalf of Guthrie Clinic LTD, Felice L. Reitknecht, Robert Packer Hospital (Montoro, Mary)
August 7, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark T. Perry on behalf of Guthrie Clinic LTD, Felice L. Reitknecht, Robert Packer Hospital (Perry, Mark)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice as to Defendant Cardiac & Vascular Surgery Associates, Inc., only. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/25/2019. (jr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Cardiac & Vascular Surgery by Charles A. Henry, Jr. (Reed, James)
July 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Scott Jayman on behalf of Anthony V. Caggiano, Sr, Med-Link Staffing (Jayman, Aaron)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney James B. Reed. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/17/19. (lg)
July 17, 2019 DOCKET ANNOTATION: verified New York bar record of Attorney James B. Reed; verify that Attorney Michael Collins is generally admitted to the Middle District of PA and is eligible to be associated counsel, as listed on the petition for special admission. (lg)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by James B Reed on behalf of Charles A. Henry, Jr Attorney James Reed is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-4815640.. (Reed, James)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 7/15/2019. (jr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (lg)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 4814366), filed by Charles A. Henry, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(lg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Pennsylvania Middle District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry v. Caggiano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony V. Caggiano, Sr.
Represented By: Aaron Scott Jayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Med-Link Staffing
Represented By: Aaron Scott Jayman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardiac & Vascular Surgery Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Packer Hospital
Represented By: Mary M. Montoro
Represented By: Mark T. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guthrie Clinic LTD
Represented By: Mary M. Montoro
Represented By: Mark T. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felice L. Reitknecht
Represented By: Mary M. Montoro
Represented By: Mark T. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles A. Henry, Jr.
Represented By: James B Reed
Represented By: Michael H. Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?